Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Gershwin A Drain
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:16-cv-14167
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Nov 28, 2016
Terminated:Jul 20, 2017
Last checked: Saturday May 27, 2017 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Guardian Alarm
Represented By
Brett J. Miller
Butzel Long
contact info
Defendant
Nemer Group Gulleria Officentre
Represented By
Brett J. Miller
Butzel Long
contact info
Defendant
Guardian Guard Service Inc.
Defendant
Guardian Guard Service, Inc
Represented By
Brett J. Miller
Butzel Long
contact info
Defendant
Brett J. Miller
Plaintiff
Glenn V. Childs
consolidated from 17-10984 10758 Somerset
Detroit, MI 48224

GPO Mar 28 2017
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS 6 AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 14 AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TBan)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
63 63 8 pgs order Order Wed 09/11 11:06 AM
ORDER Granting Plaintiff's44 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, Denying Plaintiff's43 Request to Reopen Case, and Denying Plaintiff's Requests for Leave of Court47 ,49 ,54 ,56 58 and61 . Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (TMcg)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 09/11 11:09 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re63 Order, on Glenn V. Childs at 10758 Somerset, Detroit, MI 48224. (TMcg)
Related: [-]