Giuliano v. Flashner, M.D.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12685
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12685
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-51530 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 23, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Paul Flashner, M.D.
32503 Carrie Place
Westlake Village, CA 91361 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee of American Laser Skin Care, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
![]() HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. Hearing scheduled for 7/12/2017 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Burnett, William) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Burnett, William) Modified text on 6/15/2017 (MDW) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Order Pursuant to Rule 9019 Approving Settlement Agreement with Paul Flashner M.D. Order Signed on 5/23/2017. (MDW) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of No Objection re: Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Approving Settlement Agreement With Paul Flasher M.D. Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Burnett, William) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 (Settlement Agreement with Paul Flashner M.D.) Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. Hearing scheduled for 7/12/2017 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/19/2017. (Burnett, William) Modified text on 5/1/2017 (MDW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 02/23 9:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51530 Closed (MDW) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 02/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Corrective Entry
Wed 02/08 12:01 PM
Corrective Entry: Defendant's name corrected (MDW) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Default Judgment Against Defendant Paul Flashner, M.D. Signed on 2/8/2017. (MDW) Modified Defendant's name on 2/8/2017 (MDW) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Paul Flashner, M.D. Signed on 2/8/2017. (MDW) Modified Defendant's name on 2/8/2017 (MDW) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Request for Entry of Default Judgment against Paul Flashner, M.D. Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Burnett, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Request for Entry of Default against Paul Flashner, M.D. Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Burnett, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Order requesting that Request/Motion for Default/Default Judgment or Status of adversary proceeding be filed or adversary proceeding will be dismissed. Document due by: 3/9/2017. Signed on 2/7/2017. (MDW) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Paul Flashner, M.D.. Answer Due Date: 1/5/2017 Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/6/2017. (Burnett, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 11/29 4:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51530 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (VIB) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-51530 Complaint to Avoid Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, 549 and 502 and to Recover Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 550 and 553 by Alfred T. Giuliano against Paul Flashner, M.D.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 02/27/2017. (Burnett, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |