Giuliano v. MetLife Insurance Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12685
Lead BK case is: 1:14-bk-12685
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-51533 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
MetLife Insurance Company
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfred T. Giuliano, Chapter 7 Trustee of American Laser Skin Care, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano (Burnett, William) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/07 10:30 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51533 Closed (MDW) |
||
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Between Alfred T. Giuliano and MetLife Insurance Company . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano . (Burnett, William) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Stipulation Extending Time to Answer Between Alfred T. Giuliano and MetLife Insurance Company . Filed by Alfred T. Giuliano. (Burnett, William) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant MetLife Insurance Company. Answer Due Date: 1/5/2017 Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 2/6/2017. (Burnett, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, November 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Tue 11/29 4:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51533 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number Deferred, amount $ 350.00. (VIB) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-51533 Complaint to Avoid Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, 549 and 502 and to Recover Property Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 550 and 553 by Alfred T. Giuliano against MetLife Insurance Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 02/27/2017. (Burnett, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |