Original Case: 3:15-md-02672

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-cv-17183
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:Nov 29, 2016
Terminated:Jul 09, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 11, 2018 1:35 AM PDT
In re: VOLKSWAGEN "CLEAN DIESEL" MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT BOSCH, LLC
Represented By
Matthew D. Slater
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VOLKSWAGEN, AG
Represented By
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Sharon Nelles
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
William Brian Monahan
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Sharon Nelles
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
William Brian Monahan
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AUDI, AG
Represented By
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Sharon Nelles
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
William Brian Monahan
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Cari Katrice Dawson
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Represented By
Matthew D. Slater
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AUDI OF AMERICA, LLC
Represented By
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
William Brian Monahan
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Objector - Appellant
RONALD CLARK FLESHMAN, Jr., Proposed Intervenor
Represented By
Tomas Glaspy
Howarth & Smith
contact info
Suzelle M. Smith
Howarth & Smith
contact info
James Ben Feinman
James B. Feinman & Associates
contact info
Don Howarth
Howarth & Smith
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS W. AYALA
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SCOTT MOEN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HEATHER GREENFIELD
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILL HARLAN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL CHARLES KRIMMELBEIN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CYNTHIA R. KIRTLAND
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELIZABETH BEDARD
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KEVIN BEDARD
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MELANI BUCHANAN FARMER
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ALAN BANDICS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RICHARD GROGAN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ADDISON MINOTT
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
REBECCA PERLMUTTER
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NANCY L. STIREK
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL LORENZ
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOSEPH MORREY
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MEGAN WALAWENDER
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WILLIAM ANDREW WILSON
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRIAN NICHOLAS MILLS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LAURA SWENSON
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARION B. MOORE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KURT MALLERY
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOSEPH HERR
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CHAD DIAL
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARK SCHUMACHER
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAVID EBENSTEIN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HERBERT YUSSIM
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RACHEL OTTO
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KELLY R. KING
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRETT ALTERS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ROY MCNEAL
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WHITNEY POWERS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KATHERINE MEHLS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRIAN J. BIALECKI
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NICHOLAS BOND
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARK HOULE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JERRY LAWHON
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
FARRAH P. BELL
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
TIMOTHY WATSON
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LESLIE MACLISE-KANE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARCUS ALEXANDER DOEGE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
LEO WINTERNITZ
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEPHEN VERNER
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RAYMOND KREIN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
HELEN KOISK-WESTLY
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
REBECCA KAPLAN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MICHAEL R. CRUISE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GEORGE FARQUAR
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AIMEE EPSTEIN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SARAH BURT
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JULIET BRODIE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SIMON W. BEAVEN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANNE DUNCAN ARGENTO
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
STEVEN R. THORNTON
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SUSAN TARRENCE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Kevin R. Budner
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
David S. Stellings
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RAY PRECIADO
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Kevin R. Budner
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
David S. Stellings
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JASON HILL
Represented By
James Gerard Stranch, IV
BRANSTETTER STRANCH & JENNINGS PLLC
contact info
Michael E. Heygood
Heygood, Orr, & Pearson
contact info
Frank Mario Pitre
Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP
contact info
James E. Cecchi
Carella, Byrne, Cecchi,Olstein, Brody & Agnello
contact info
Rosemary M. Rivas
FINKELSTEIN THOMPSON LLP
contact info
David S. Casey Jr.
CASEY, GERRY, SCHENK, FRANCAVILLA, BLATT & PENFIELD, LLP
contact info
Roxanne Barton Conlin
Roxanne Conlin & Associates, PC
contact info
Adam J. Levitt
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info
James Gerard Stranch IV
BRANSTETTER STRANCH & JENNINGS PLLC
contact info
Michael D. Hausfeld
Hausfeld LLP
contact info
David Boies
BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER LLP
contact info
Roland Karim Tellis
Baron & Budd, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Kevin R. Budner
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy LLC
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
David S. Stellings
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP
contact info
Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Keller Rohrback LLP
contact info
Joseph F. Rice
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
Christopher A. Seeger
Seeger Weiss LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
THOMAS J. BUCHBERGER
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DAVID MCCARTHY
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ANNE MAHLE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
WOLFGANG STEUDEL
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MARK ROVNER
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DENISE DE FIESTA
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
MATTHEW CURE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
DANIEL SULLIVAN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CARMEL RUBIN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELIZABETH EVANS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RUSSELL EVANS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
RYAN JOSEPH SCHUETTE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
FLOYD BECK WARREN
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ERIC DAVIDSON WHITE
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AARON JOY
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CARLA BERG
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRITNEY LYNNE SCHNATHORST
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CESAR OLMOS
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KARL FRY
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
SCOTT BAHR
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JOHN C. DUFURRENA
Represented By
Elizabeth J. Cabraser
Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Steve Berman
Hagens Berman
contact info

GPO Jul 09 2018
FILED OPINION (A. WALLACE TASHIMA, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and MARSHA S. BERZON) AFFIRMED. Judge: MSB Authoring. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [10934395] [16-17157, 16-17158, 16-17166, 16-17168, 16-17183, 16-17185]

Docket last updated: 07/11/2018 1:32 AM PDT

Create an account to get the full docket for this case.