Hawaii District Court
Judge:J Michael Seabright
Referred: Kenneth J Mansfield
Case #: 1:16-cv-00634
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2016
Re-opened:Nov 07, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 28, 2017 11:25 PM HST
Defendant
Hamakua Energy Partners, L.P.
Represented By
Steven M. Egesdal
Carlsmith Ball Llp Honolulu
contact info
Ian L. Sandison
Carlsmith Ball Llp Honolulu
contact info
Richard Sutton Snyder, Sr.
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Joyce W. Y. Tam-Sugiyama
Carlsmith Ball Llp Honolulu
contact info
Defendant
Hawaii Electric Light Company, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas R. Monlux
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
David A. Applebaum
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
David M. Louie
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
Joseph A. Stewart
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
C. Fairley Spillman
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Corey W. Roush
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hawaiian Electric Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas R. Monlux
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
David A. Applebaum
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
David M. Louie
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
Joseph A. Stewart
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
C. Fairley Spillman
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Corey W. Roush
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nextera Energy, Inc.
Represented By
Raul A. Campillo
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Paul Alston
Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing - Honolulu
contact info
James Pearl
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Sarah A. Pfeiffer
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Kenneth R. O'Rourke
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Claire Wong Black
Alston Hunt Floyd & Ing
contact info
Defendant
Hawaiian Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas R. Monlux
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
David A. Applebaum
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
David M. Louie
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
Joseph A. Stewart
Kobayashi Sugita & Goda
contact info
C. Fairley Spillman
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Corey W. Roush
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC
Represented By
Christian E. Baker
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Rex Y. Fujichaku
Bronster Fujichaku Robbins
contact info
Margery S. Bronster
Bronster Fujichaku Robbins
contact info
Kelly Anne Higa
Bronster Fujichaku Robbins
contact info
Barry W. Lee
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
contact info
Ian L. Sandison
Carlsmith Ball Llp Honolulu
contact info
Wil K. Yamamoto
contact info
Stephen S. Mayne
Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 19 2017
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS NEXTERA ENERGY, INC.'S AND HAMAKUA ENERGY PARTNERS, L.P.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ECF NOS. 73 & 95, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Excerpt of conclusion:"The Motions to Dismiss are GRANTED as to Counts One and Two, and those claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Because the court DEFERS ruling on the state-law claims, the Motions as to Counts Seven and Eight are DENIED without prejudice. The court will allow Hu Honua an opportunity to file a Second Amended Complaint that cures the FAC's deficiencies, if it believes it can do so. See Lopez, 203 F.3d at 1130. A Second Amended Complaint (or a statement indicating that a Second Amended Complaint will not be filed) is due by January 29, 2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/19/2017. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held November 6, 2017. Minutes of hearing: ECF 127. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
GPO Jan 19 2018
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS NEXTERA ENERGY, INC.'S AND HAMAKUA ENERGY PARTNERS, L.P.'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ECF NOS. 73 & 95, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/19/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER amends the Court's Order filed 12/19/2017 as ECF no. 131. Related: Order, ECF 136. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
GPO Nov 09 2018
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART DEFENDANT NEXTERA ENERGY, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, ECF NO. 148. "NextEra's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED as to Counts One and Two; the federal antitrust claims against NextEra are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Motion to Dismiss the state law claims (Counts Seven and Eight) is DENIED without prejudice." Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/9/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held 7/9/2018. Minutes of hearing: ECF 180.
GPO Sep 12 2024
ORDER (1) AFFIRMING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF HU HONUA BIOENERGY, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT AND FOR PERMISSIVE JOINDER, ECF NO. 243; AND (2) DENYING FURTHER LEAVE TO AMEND ANTITRUST CLAIMS - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/12/2024. The Magistrate Judge's April 2, 2024 Order is AFFIRMED.(jni)
GPO Apr 17 2025
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 271, AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT HAWAIIAN ELECTRIC LIGHT CO., INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, ECF NO. 270 re 270, 271 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/17/2025.   For the reasons set forth above, the court GRANTS IN PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 271, as to the federal antitrust claims (Counts I and II) only. The court declines to exercise jurisdiction over the remaining state-law claims (Counts III, IV, V and VII) and they are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Defendant HELCO's Motion to Compel Arbitration is accordingly DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk shall close the case.(jni)
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
286 286 appeal Attorney Appeal Packet Fri 05/16 4:08 PM
Attorney Appeal Packet re283 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC, USCA No. 25-3169 (eta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal,
Att: 2 Instructions for Civil Appeals,
Att: 3 Additional Instructions for Transcript Designation and Ordering Form,
Att: 4 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form (Court reporter contact information can be found at http://www.hid.uscourts.gov/contact-us/reporters),
Att: 5 Docket Sheet
285 285 appeal USCA Scheduling Order Fri 05/16 3:22 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to283 Notice of Appeal filed by Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC, USCA No. 25-3169 (eta)
Related: [-]
284 284 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 05/16 3:20 PM
Docketing Notice / USCA Case Number 25-3169 for283 Notice of Appeal filed by Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC. (eta)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
283 283 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 05/14 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to282 Clerk's Judgment, by Hu Honua Bioenergy, LLC. Filing fee $ 605. AHIDC-3153715 (Swanson, Daniel) Modified on 5/14/2025 to add receipt number (eta)
Related: [-]