Tan v. SHK Management Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Loretta A Preska |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-09302 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2017 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Marizela Alfaro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaqueline Austin
|
|
Defendant
Robert S Grossman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bradley I Korman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lawrence Korman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Korman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven H. Korman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathleen M Palmen
|
|
Defendant
SHK Management Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Choo Lee Tan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
51 | 51
order
Memo Endorsement
Thu 12/28 10:18 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:50 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/27/2017) (jwh) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
50 | 50
misc
Letter
Tue 12/26 10:41 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John Ho dated December 26, 2017 re: request for a forty five (45) day stay of all deadlines due to tentative settlement. Document filed by Marizela Alfaro, Robert S Grossman, Bradley I Korman, Lawrence Korman, Mark Korman, Steven H. Korman, SHK Management Inc..(Ho, John) |