Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: P Bradley Murray
Case #: 1:16-cv-00597
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 30, 2016
Terminated:Aug 08, 2017
Defendant
Cynthia Stewart
Defendant
John Robert Fountain
Plaintiff
Eric Lee Brown

GPO Jul 14 2017
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Eric Lee Brown that prior to service, this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted as to the access to courts and conspiracy claim and that the custody claim to be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous, in the alternative, dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim and alternatively, dismissed without prejudice as malicious. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/13/2017. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
GPO Aug 08 2017
ORDER ADOPTING 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint as follows: the custody claim against defendant Stewart is dismissed with prejudice and all other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/8/2017. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 04/28 2:12 PM
Partial Filing fee: $13.00, receipt number 1065262. (fz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
16 16 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 01/15 1:52 PM
Partial Filing fee: $52.00, receipt number 1064882. (fz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 10/15 4:36 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 21.20, receipt number 1064582. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
14 14 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 08/27 12:51 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 46.00, receipt number 1064395. (jmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 06/24 3:51 PM
Partial Filing fee: $ 11.00, receipt number 1064173. (cjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 05/07 4:15 PM
Partial Filing fee: $28.00, receipt number 1063978. (fz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
11 11 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 08/23 11:42 AM
Partial Filing fee: $102.42, receipt number 1060866. (cjr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
10 10 order Judgment Tue 08/08 11:32 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing the custody claim against Stewart with prejudice and all other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/8/2017. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Tue 08/08 11:28 AM
ORDER ADOPTING8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint as follows: the custody claim against defendant Stewart is dismissed with prejudice and all other claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 8/8/2017. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
utility Document Referred Mon 08/07 2:12 PM
REFERRAL OF8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Eric Lee Brown to Judge DuBose. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2017
8 8 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 07/14 12:14 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Eric Lee Brown that prior to service, this action be dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted as to the access to courts and conspiracy claim and that the custody claim to be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous, in the alternative, dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim and alternatively, dismissed without prejudice as malicious. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/13/2017. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
7 7 utility Case Transferred Thu 03/09 12:00 PM
This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (cmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/25 2:53 PM
NOTICE by Eric Lee Brown of filing request with Fountain for payment of the partial fee of $6.36 (cmj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
5 5 order Order ADOC Collect Remainder Filing Fee Tue 01/17 4:13 PM
Order for Payment of Remainder of Prisoner Filing Fee. ADOC to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 1/17/2017. (copy to ADOC, finance, business manager and plaintiff) (cmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
4 4 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 01/04 7:56 AM
Filing fee: $ 6.36, receipt number 46031041784; ref to Judge Cassady (cmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
3 3 order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/21 10:54 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filing Fee of $6.36 due by 1/11/2017.. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 12/21/2016.(copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2016
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 12/01 8:18 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Lee Brown. Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (cmj)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/01 8:17 AM
1983 COMPLAINT against John Robert Fountain, Cynthia Stewart, filed by Eric Lee Brown; ref to Judge Cassady. (cmj)
Related: [-]