Cielo Inc v. ArchPoint Consulting LLC
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-01597 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 30, 2017 3:35 AM CDT |
Defendant
ArchPoint Consulting LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Cielo Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Wed 01/25 3:31 PM
Case Terminated pursuant to6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (asc) |
||
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 01/24 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cielo Inc. (Bianchi, Albert) |
|
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 01/09 1:48 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ArchPoint Consulting LLC waiver sent on 12/22/2016, answer due 2/21/2017. (Bianchi, Albert) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 12/22 1:27 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Cielo Inc.. (Bianchi, Albert) |
|
Tuesday, December 13, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 12/13 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Bianchi on behalf of Cielo Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Albert Bianchi, Jr. (Bianchi, Albert) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Tue 12/13 11:03 AM
Summons Issued as to ArchPoint Consulting LLC. (asc) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/06 9:06 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Cielo Inc.. (Sarskas, S) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/01 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against ArchPoint Consulting LLC by Cielo Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-2473024)(Sarskas, S) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 12/01 3:47 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |