Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:George C Smith
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:16-cv-01148
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:754 Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2016
Terminated:Aug 28, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jun 04, 2017 4:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Martin Kloock
7451 Worthington Galena Road
Worthington, OH 43085
Represented By
Andrew J. Barber
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Anne E Martinez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ronald Urbano
7451 Worthington Galena Road
Worthington, OH 43085
Represented By
Andrew J. Barber
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Anne E Martinez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC
7451 Worthington Galena Road
Worthington, OH 43085
Represented By
Andrew J. Barber
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Anne E Martinez
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nikkeya Andrich
23759 Sandusky Road
Marysville, OH 43040
Represented By
Kenneth E. Smith
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info

GPO Apr 10 2017
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/10/2017. (agm)

Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Monday, August 28, 2017
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/28 2:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Defendants Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC, Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 01, 2017
17 17 order Order Reassigning Case Sat 07/01 10:33 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/30/17. (jcw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
16 16 order Protective Order Mon 04/10 4:14 PM
CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/10/2017. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2017
15 15 misc Stipulation Fri 04/07 10:25 AM
STIPULATION of Confidentiality Agreement by Defendants Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC, Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
14 14 order Order Tue 04/04 8:43 AM
ORDER disapproving13 Stipulation of Confidentiality Agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 4/4/2017. (agm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
13 13 misc Stipulation Fri 03/31 12:25 PM
STIPULATION of Confidentiality Agreement by Defendants Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC, Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, February 23, 2017
12 12 med Notice Setting Mediation Thu 02/23 6:06 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Thomas Tyack to conduct Settlement Week Conference on 3/17/2017 at 10:30 AM. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
11 11 order Order Wed 02/15 1:27 PM
ORDER - Case referred to March 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 2/15/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2017
10 10 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Tue 01/31 5:23 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the MARCH 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 2/20/2017. Discovery due by 7/6/2017. Dispositive motions due by 8/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 1/31/2017. (agm)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 01/31 5:29 PM
Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (jv)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
9 9 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 01/09 12:20 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT of Parties by Defendants Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC, Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/22 3:22 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp on 12/22/2016. (kk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
7 7 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/21 2:57 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-5775634) of Anne Martinez by Defendants Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC, Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/13 2:21 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint with Jury Demand and Separate Defenses filed by Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC, Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 12/12 3:24 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 1/31/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 12/07 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Aramark Refreshment Services, LLC, Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano of Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 10:44 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Nikkeya Andrich (Complaint filed in State Court on 11/8/16). (sem)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/06 4:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Aramark Refreshments Services, LLC, Aramark identifying Corporate Parent Aramark for Aramark Refreshments Services, LLC.. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 12/06 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 16 CV 010632 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5757152), filed by Martin Kloock, Ronald Urbano, Aramark Refreshments Services, LLC. (Barber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet