Colorado District Court
Judge:Wiley Y Daniel
Referred: Nina Y Wang
Case #: 1:16-cv-02986
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2016
Terminated:Aug 02, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jun 04, 2017 3:19 AM MDT
Defendant
Cynthia H. Coffman
Represented By
Grant T. Sullivan
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Grove
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
LeeAnn Morrill
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
John W. Hickenlooper, Jr.
Represented By
Grant T. Sullivan
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Grove
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
LeeAnn Morrill
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Wayne W. Williams
Represented By
Grant T. Sullivan
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Matthew David Grove
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
LeeAnn Morrill
Colorado Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Intervenor
Colorado Republican Committee
Represented By
Christopher Owen Murray
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Denver
contact info
Intervenor
Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher Owen Murray
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Denver
contact info
Intervenor
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Christopher Owen Murray
Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, Llp-Denver
contact info
Plaintiff
Polly Baca
Represented By
Jason Bryan Wesoky
Darling Milligan Horowitz PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Nemanich
Represented By
Jason Bryan Wesoky
Darling Milligan Horowitz PC
contact info

GPO Dec 21 2016
ORDER Denying 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Robert Nemanich, Polly Baca. Plaintiffs have failed to meet the requirements to grant a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction in this matter, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/21/2016. (evana, )
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
58 58 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/02 3:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE THIS MATTER is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice, or, in the Alternative Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice ECF No.57 , filed August 1, 2017. Plaintiffs notify the Court that they wish to voluntarily dismiss their case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Plaintiffs filed their Amended Complaint ECF No.55 on July 18, 2017, and none of the Defendants has filed an answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint or other responsive pleading. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to pay its own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 8/2/2017. (evana, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
57 57 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Tue 08/01 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case without Prejudice, or in the Alternative, Stipulated Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Polly Baca, Robert Nemanich (Wesoky, Jason)
Related: [-]