District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Dabney L Friedrich
Case #: 1:16-cv-02394
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2016
Last checked: Monday Jun 05, 2017 4:52 AM EDT
Amicus
STATE ASSOCIATIONS AFFILIATED WITH INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA
Represented By
Daniel Brett Kohlhofer
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Amicus
INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA
Represented By
Daniel Brett Kohlhofer
Dechert, LLP
contact info
Defendant
NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION
Represented By
Andrew Marshall Bernie
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Movant
RHODE ISLAND BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NEBRASKA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NEVADA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NEW HAMPSHIRE BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NEW MEXICO BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NEW YORK BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NORTH CAROLINA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
NORTH DAKOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
OHIO BANKERS LEAGUE
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
OKLAHOMA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
OREGON BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
PENNSYLVANIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
ARIZONA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
SOUTH CAROLINA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
SOUTH DAKOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
TENNESSEE BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
TEXAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
UTAH BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
VERMONT BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
VIRGINIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
WASHINGTON BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
WEST VIRGINIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
WISCONSIN BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
WYOMING BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MISSOURI BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
ALASKA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
ARKANSAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
CALIFORNIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
COLORADO BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
CONNECTICUT BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
DELAWARE BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
FLORIDA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
GEORGIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
HAWAII BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
IDAHO BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
ILLINOIS BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
ILLINOIS LEAGUE OF FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
ALABAMA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
INDIANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
IOWA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
KANSAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
KENTUCKY BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
LOUISIANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MAINE BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MARYLAND BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MASSACHUSETTS BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MICHIGAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MINNESOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MISSISSIPPI BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Movant
MONTANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Steven D. Gordon
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Andrew J. Soukup
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info
Philip J. Levitz
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Andrew Soukup
Covington & Burling, LLP
contact info
Robert Allen Long, Jr.
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiff's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment and the defendant's 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 29, 2018. (MJS)
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 07, 2020
42 42 order .Order Tue 01/07 9:17 AM
ORDER entering the41 Judgment from the Court of Appeals. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 7, 2020. (lcdlf3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2019
41 41 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 01/02 11:01 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION,39 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION ; USCA Case Number 18-5154 Consolidated with 18-5181 (zrdj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA Judgment
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
appeal USCA Case Number Thu 06/14 11:55 AM
USCA Case Number 18-5181 for39 Notice of Cross Appeal filed by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION. (zvt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
40 40 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 06/05 2:12 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re39 Notice of Cross Appeal. (jf)
Related: [-]
39 39 appeal Notice of Cross Appeal Tue 06/05 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5516385. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Levitz, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
appeal USCA Case Number Tue 05/29 4:49 PM
USCA Case Number 18-5154 for37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION. (zrdj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
38 38 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 05/23 4:13 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the appeal was filed by the government re37 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
Related: [-]
37 37 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Wed 05/23 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to35 Memorandum & Opinion,34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/19 4:02 PM
NOTICE (Other) by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
35 35 39 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 03/29 2:49 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiff's14 Motion for Summary Judgment and the defendant's19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 29, 2018. (MJS)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Thu 03/29 2:48 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part the plaintiff's14 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part the defendant's19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See text of order for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 29, 2018. (MJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
33 33 misc Transcript Tue 03/27 1:15 PM
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich held on 03/14/2018. Page Numbers: 1-53. Date of Issuance: 03/27/2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sara A. Wick, Telephone number, 202-354-3284. Tape Number: N/A. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/17/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018.(Wick, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2018
32 32 respm Supplemental Memorandum Fri 03/16 11:40 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to In Response to Court's Order filed by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION.(Levitz, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix 1,
Att: 2 Appendix 2,
Att: 3 Appendix 3,
Att: 4 Appendix 4,
Att: 5 Appendix 5,
Att: 6 Appendix 6,
Att: 7 Appendix 7
31 31 respm Supplemental Memorandum Fri 03/16 11:34 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to In Response to Court's Order filed by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION.(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 03/14 11:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dabney L. Friedrich: Motion Hearing held on 3/14/2018 regarding14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION, and19 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION. Oral arguments from both parties were heard by the Court, and the motions will be taken under advisement. Scheduling order forthcoming from chambers. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick.) (jl)
Related: [-]
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/14 12:30 PM
MINUTE ORDER. As directed at today's motion hearing, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff and the defendant shall each file a supplementary memorandum no later than 12:00 p.m. on March 16, 2018. Each memorandum shall not not exceed five pages, excluding any appendices. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 14, 2018. (JPF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Fri 03/02 7:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall appear at 10:00 a.m. on March 14, 2018 in Courtroom 12 for a motion hearing regarding14 the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and19 the defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. In addition to the briefing, the parties shall be prepared to discuss: (1) the meaning of the phrase "rural district" based on dictionaries and other sources of common usage at the time of enactment of the Federal Credit Union Act of 1934; and (2) the scope of the plaintiff's challenge to the provisions of 81 Fed. Reg. 88,412 that address Core-Based Statistical Areas, particularly in light of paragraph 53 of the complaint. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 2, 2018. (JPF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
30 30 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Fri 01/12 12:28 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION(Levitz, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, December 04, 2017
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 12/04 3:08 PM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/27 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Steven Gill Bradbury by INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA, STATE ASSOCIATIONS AFFILIATED WITH INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA (Kohlhofer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2017
28 28 respm Response to (non-motion) Document Fri 10/06 1:16 PM
RESPONSE re27 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION. (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
27 27 notice Notice of Supplemental Authority Tue 10/03 10:40 AM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION(Levitz, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
26 26 misc Joint Appendix Wed 08/23 10:04 AM
JOINT APPENDIX by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION.(Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
25 25 respm Reply to opposition to motion Wed 08/09 4:28 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re19 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION. (Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
24 24 respm Reply to opposition to motion Thu 07/20 3:30 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION. (See Docket Entry23 to view document). (znmw)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response to motion Wed 07/19 5:01 PM
RESPONSE re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,19 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment COMBINED MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION.(Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting ABA's Motion For Summary Judgment and Denying NCUA's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment
Thursday, June 29, 2017
22 22 misc Amicus Brief Fri 06/30 11:03 AM
AMICUS BRIEF by CREDIT UNION NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CUNA MUTUAL GROUP. (td)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 06/29 4:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/29/2017. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
21 21 motion Leave to File Document Wed 06/28 4:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by CREDIT UNION NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CUNA Mutual Group, National Association of Federally-Insured Credit Unions(Rushing, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
20 20 respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Wed 06/21 5:48 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION.(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 motion Summary Judgment Wed 06/21 5:45 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 05, 2017
18 18 misc Amicus Brief Mon 06/05 3:43 PM
AMICUS BRIEF by ALABAMA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ALASKA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ARIZONA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ARKANSAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, COLORADO BANKERS ASSOCIATION, CONNECTICUT BANKERS ASSOCIATION, DELAWARE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, FLORIDA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, GEORGIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, HAWAII BANKERS ASSOCIATION, IDAHO BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ILLINOIS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ILLINOIS LEAGUE OF FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS, INDIANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, IOWA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, KANSAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, KENTUCKY BANKERS ASSOCIATION, LOUISIANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MAINE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MARYLAND BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MASSACHUSETTS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MICHIGAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MINNESOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MISSISSIPPI BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MISSOURI BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MONTANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEBRASKA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEVADA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW HAMPSHIRE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW MEXICO BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW YORK BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NORTH CAROLINA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NORTH DAKOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, OHIO BANKERS LEAGUE, OKLAHOMA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, OREGON BANKERS ASSOCIATION, PENNSYLVANIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, RHODE ISLAND BANKERS ASSOCIATION, SOUTH CAROLINA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, SOUTH DAKOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, TENNESSEE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, TEXAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, UTAH BANKERS ASSOCIATION, VERMONT BANKERS ASSOCIATION, VIRGINIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WEST VIRGINIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WISCONSIN BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WYOMING BANKERS ASSOCIATION. (ztd)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Amicus Brief Mon 06/05 3:38 PM
AMICUS BRIEF by INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA, STATE ASSOCIATIONS AFFILIATED WITH INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA. (td)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 06/05 11:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting15 ,16 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/05/2017. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2017
16 16 motion Leave to File Document Fri 06/02 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by IOWA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ALABAMA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ALASKA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ARIZONA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ARKANSAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, CALIFORNIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, COLORADO BANKERS ASSOCIATION, CONNECTICUT BANKERS ASSOCIATION, DELAWARE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, FLORIDA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, GEORGIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, HAWAII BANKERS ASSOCIATION, IDAHO BANKERS ASSOCIATION, ILLINOIS LEAGUE OF FINANCIAL INSTITUTIONS, ILLINOIS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, INDIANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, KANSAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, KENTUCKY BANKERS ASSOCIATION, LOUISIANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MAINE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MARYLAND BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MASSACHUSETTS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MICHIGAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MINNESOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MISSISSIPPI BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MISSOURI BANKERS ASSOCIATION, MONTANA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEBRASKA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEVADA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW HAMPSHIRE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW JERSEY BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW MEXICO BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NEW YORK BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NORTH CAROLINA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, NORTH DAKOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, OHIO BANKERS LEAGUE, OKLAHOMA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, OREGON BANKERS ASSOCIATION, PENNSYLVANIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, RHODE ISLAND BANKERS ASSOCIATION, SOUTH CAROLINA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, SOUTH DAKOTA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, TENNESSEE BANKERS ASSOCIATION, TEXAS BANKERS ASSOCIATION, UTAH BANKERS ASSOCIATION, VERMONT BANKERS ASSOCIATION, VIRGINIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WEST VIRGINIA BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WISCONSIN BANKERS ASSOCIATION, WYOMING BANKERS ASSOCIATION(Gordon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Amicus Brief
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Fri 06/02 3:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA, STATE ASSOCIATIONS AFFILIATED WITH INDEPENDENT COMMUNITY BANKERS OF AMERICA(Kohlhofer, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Brief of the Independent Community Bankers of America and Affiliated State Associations as Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiff the American Bankers Association
Friday, May 26, 2017
14 14 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/26 8:21 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION(Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Martin Connors,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Paul Domke,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Morgan Harmison,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Pennie Lutz,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Kathleen Corey Marcum,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Ruben Robledo,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Lynn Schneider,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Gregg Tewksbury,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Brian Thompson,
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, May 05, 2017
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/05 6:27 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Certified List of Contents of the Administrative Record by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of List of Contents of Administrative Record,
Att: 2 Certified List of Contents of the Administrative Record
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/02 4:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown,12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file the certified list of the contents of the administrative record on or before 5/5/2017, and that Plaintiff shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 5/26/2017. All other schedule deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/02/2017. (lckbj1, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
12 12 motion Extension of Time to Thu 04/27 2:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified List of Contents of the Administrative Record by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 31, 2017
order Order on Motion for Scheduling Order Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/31 7:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule is set in this matter: Defendant shall file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record on or before 5/1/17; Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due on or before 5/22/17; Defendant's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment is due on or before 6/21/17; Plaintiff's combined reply and opposition is due on or before 7/19/17; Defendant's reply is due on or before 8/9/17; and the parties shall submit a joint appendix on or before 8/23/17. The Court will assess its need for a hearing once it has reviewed the parties' briefs. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/31/2017. (lckbj3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Sun 04/02 9:36 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 6/21/2017. Response to Cross Motions due by 7/19/2017. Reply to Cross Motions due by 8/9/2017. (gdf)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2017
11 11 motion Scheduling Order Fri 03/24 2:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION(Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 13, 2017
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 03/13 8:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this case challenging administrative action are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, on or before ]3/27/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 03/13/2017. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2017
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/10 2:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION.(Bernie, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 01/17 5:52 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION served on 1/9/2017 (Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 01/17 5:51 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/10/17. (Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Tue 01/17 5:49 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/11/2017. (Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2016
6 6 order .Order Thu 12/08 5:10 PM
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/8/2016. (lckbj1)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 12/08 2:09 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(sb)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 12/08 2:01 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/07 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Levitz on behalf of AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION (Levitz, Philip)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/07 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Soukup on behalf of AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION (Soukup, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 12/07 11:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION. (Long, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 11:53 AM
COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CREDIT UNION ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4767690) filed by AMERICAN BANKERS ASSOCIATION.(Long, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Final Rule,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - Attorney General of the United States,
Att: 4 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia,
Att: 5 Summons Summons - National Credit Union Association