Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William S Duffey, Jr
Case #: 1:16-cv-04506
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Race Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 06, 2016
Terminated:Jul 25, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jun 04, 2017 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Time Warner Inc.
Represented By
James Andrew Lamberth
Troutman Sanders, Llp-Atl
contact info
Dionysia L. Johnson-Massie
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Amy Mariko Palesch
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Leslie A. Dent
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.
Represented By
James Andrew Lamberth
Troutman Sanders, Llp-Atl
contact info
Dionysia L. Johnson-Massie
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Amy Mariko Palesch
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Leslie A. Dent
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Turner Services, Inc.
Represented By
James Andrew Lamberth
Troutman Sanders, Llp-Atl
contact info
Dionysia L. Johnson-Massie
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Amy Mariko Palesch
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Leslie A. Dent
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Defendant
Cable News Network, Inc.
Represented By
James Andrew Lamberth
Troutman Sanders, Llp-Atl
contact info
Dionysia L. Johnson-Massie
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Amy Mariko Palesch
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Leslie A. Dent
Littler Mendelson Pc - Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernest Colbert, Jr.
Represented By
Daniel R. Meachum
Daniel R. Meachum & Associates, LLC
contact info
James D. Williams
Law Offices Of James D. Williams
contact info
James E. Voyles
The Voyles Milhollin Law Firm
contact info
Mario Bernard Williams
Williams Oinonen, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Celeslie Henley
Represented By
Daniel R. Meachum
Daniel R. Meachum & Associates, LLC
contact info
James D. Williams
Law Offices Of James D. Williams
contact info
James E. Voyles
The Voyles Milhollin Law Firm
contact info
Mario Bernard Williams
Williams Oinonen, LLC
contact info

GPO Jul 25 2017
OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss 34, granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Strike, and/or for More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Complaint 17 and denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Voluntarily Withdraw Original Complaint 27 and ordering that this action be dismissed. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/25/17. (ddm)
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
38 38 misc Judgment - Clerk Tue 07/25 12:10 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action. (ddm)
Related: [-]
37 37 50 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Tue 07/25 12:07 PM
OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss34 , granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Strike, and/or for More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Complaint17 and denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint to Voluntarily Withdraw Original Complaint27 and ordering that this action be dismissed. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 7/25/17. (ddm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 07/25 12:11 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2017
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 05/22 11:25 AM
Submission of34 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Defendants' Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2017
36 36 7 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 05/05 4:03 PM
RESPONSE re34 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Defendants' Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
35 35 misc Leave of Absence Tue 05/02 1:57 PM
Application for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 5-15, 2017 June 18-20, 2017, by Daniel R. Meachum. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/01 10:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply In Opposition to Defendants' Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Ernest Colbert, Jr, Celeslie Henley.(Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Surreply
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 05/01 4:02 PM
Submission of27 MOTION for Leave to file Amended Complaint , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 04/21 11:37 AM
Submission of17 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement, submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2017
33 33 16 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 04/14 2:32 PM
RESPONSE re27 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint filed by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc..(Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
32 32 respm Reply Brief Fri 04/14 1:43 PM
REPLY BRIEF re17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
31 31 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/10 11:48 AM
NOTICE by Celeslie Henley Notice of Leave of Absence (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 03/29 2:48 PM
ORDER granting Defendants Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of their Motion to Dismiss, Strike, and/or for more Definite Statement of Plaintiffs Complaint28 and Defendants Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint29 . Defendants shall file, on or before April 14, 2017, their reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss, Strike, and/or for more Definite Statement of Plaintiffs Complaint17 . Defendants shall file, on or before April 14, 2017, their response to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint27 . Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/29/17. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
29 29 5 pgs motion Extension of Time Tue 03/28 11:15 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time re:27 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2017
28 28 motion Extension of Time Mon 03/27 5:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Strike, and/or For More Definite Statement of Plaintiffs' Complaint re:17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement with Brief In Support by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
27 27 8 pgs motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/23 11:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to file Amended Complaint by Celeslie Henley.(Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 41 pgs Exhibit
26 26 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/23 11:08 PM
RESPONSE re17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Celeslie Henley. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
25 25 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 03/09 6:53 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
24 24 respm Response (Non-Motion) Wed 03/08 3:00 PM
Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Section III of the February 7, 2017 Joint Statement18 filed by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc. (ddm)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 03/08 2:57 PM
ORDER granting Defendants Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs Section III of the February 7, 2017, Joint Statement20 . The Clerk of Court is directed to file Defendants Response to the Joint Statement [20-1] as of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/8/17. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 02/28 10:01 AM
Submission of20 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Section III of the February 7, 2017 Joint Statement , submitted to District Judge William S. Duffey. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 02/22 7:06 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time through 3/23/17 for plaintiffs to file a response to the17 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement . No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 2/21/17. (jpa) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2017
21 21 motion Extension of Time Mon 02/20 3:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Celeslie Henley. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Thu 02/09 8:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Section III of the February 7, 2017 Joint Statement with Brief In Support by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc..(Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, February 08, 2017
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/08 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James Andrew Lamberth on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc. (Lamberth, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2017
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 02/07 6:54 PM
NOTICE by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc. and Joint Statement Required By Local Rule 23.1 Regarding Class Communications(Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
17 17 5 pgs motion Dismiss Strike More Definite Statement Tue 02/07 5:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Strike1 Complaint, , MOTION for More Definite Statement by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc..(Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Brief,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Monday, January 23, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 01/23 1:19 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Defendants'16 Motion for Extension of Time to 2/7/2017 for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/23/2017. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2017
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Fri 01/20 11:36 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/19 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Voyles on behalf of Ernest Colbert, Jr, Celeslie Henley (Voyles, James)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/19 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Meachum on behalf of Celeslie Henley (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/19 8:15 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Attorney James D. Williams'4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Celeslie Henley. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 1/19/2017. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/18 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Mariko Palesch on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc. (Palesch, Amy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/18 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dionysia L. Johnson-Massie on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc. (Johnson-Massie, Dionysia)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/18 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie A. Dent on behalf of Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 01/18 2:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner Inc. for Turner Broadcasting System, Inc.; Corporate Parent Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. for Cable News Network, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 01/18 11:08 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, (Joint Stipulation To Extend The Time For Defendants To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint) by Cable News Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., Turner Services, Inc.. (Dent, Leslie)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Wed 01/18 4:54 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:4 APPLICATION for Admission of James D. Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6891298). Attorney James D. Williams added appearing on behalf of Ernest Colbert, Jr, Celeslie Henley (pmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
8 8 service Return of Service Executed Fri 01/06 10:54 AM
Return of Service Executed by Celeslie Henley. Time Warner Inc. served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Return of Service Executed Fri 01/06 10:53 AM
Return of Service Executed by Celeslie Henley. Turner Broadcasting System, Inc. served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Fri 01/06 10:52 AM
Return of Service Executed by Celeslie Henley. Turner Services, Inc. served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Return of Service Executed Fri 01/06 10:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service Proof of Service , as to Cable News Network., Return of Service Executed by Celeslie Henley. Cable News Network, Inc. served on 1/5/2017, answer due 1/26/2017. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2016
4 4 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 12/30 1:44 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of James D. Williams Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-6891298)by Celeslie Henley. (Meachum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
3 3 order Order of Recusal Wed 12/07 3:58 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Clarence Cooper recused. Case reassigned to Judge William S. Duffey, Jr., for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:16-cv-4506-WSD. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 12/7/16. (jta)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 12/07 12:34 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Cable New Network, Inc., Time Warner Inc., Turner Broadcasting System, Inc., and Turner Services, Inc.(bnw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Time Warner,
Att: 2 Summons Turner Broadcasting System,
Att: 3 Summons Turner Services
Tuesday, December 06, 2016
1 1 41 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Celeslie Henley and Ernest Colbert, Jr.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6852599.)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 13 pgs Exhibit A