Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-48119

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:16-ap-05111
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Dec 07, 2016
Terminated:Mar 10, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Investment-Retrievers, Inc
Represented By
Investment-Retrievers, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Konstantinos Stathis
741 Briarcliff Drive
Grosse Pointe, MI 48236
Represented By
Marshall D. Schultz
contact info
Plaintiff
Olga Panagos-Stathis
741 Briarcliff Drive
Grosse Pointe, MI 48236
Represented By
Marshall D. Schultz
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, March 16, 2017
court Minute Entry. Hearing Cancelled Thu 03/16 11:08 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Cancelled; Motion granted prior to hearing. Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Olga Panagos-Stathis, Konstantinos Stathis
Friday, March 10, 2017
13 13 order Default Judgment Fri 03/10 12:12 PM
ORDER OF JUDGMENT Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] 5
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 03/10 12:12 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:16-ap-5111 : Granted by Default Judgment. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/10 12:13 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-5111 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
12 12 misc Exhibit Thu 03/09 10:14 AM
Exhibit re: Declaration of Debtor Regarding Fair Market Value of Residence Filed by Plaintiffs Olga Panagos-Stathis, Konstantinos Stathis Related [+]. (Schultz, Marshall)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, March 03, 2017
11 11 order Adjourning Hearing Fri 03/03 2:47 PM
Order of the Court to Adjourn Related [+] So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm Hearing to be held on 3/16/2017 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1975 for5 , (csiku)
Related: [-] Motion for Default Judgment5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Konstantinos Stathis, Plaintiff Olga Panagos-Stathis
Thursday, March 02, 2017
10 10 audio . Thu 03/02 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/2/2017 10:02:48 AM ]. File Size [ 464 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:56 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Exhibit Thu 03/02 11:09 AM
Exhibit indicating State Equalized Value for 741 Briarcliff Filed by Plaintiffs Olga Panagos-Stathis, Konstantinos Stathis Related [+]. (Schultz, Marshall)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Thu 03/02 10:05 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 03/16/2017 at 10:00 AM (csiku)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Olga Panagos-Stathis, Konstantinos Stathis
Thursday, February 23, 2017
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (BK) Thu 02/23 9:17 AM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 03/02/2017 at 10:00 AM (csiku)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Olga Panagos-Stathis, Konstantinos Stathis
Sunday, February 12, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Adjourned Hearing Mon 02/13 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Adjourned Hearing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP)
Friday, February 10, 2017
7 7 court Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP) Fri 02/10 11:47 AM
Notice of Adjourned Hearing. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 3/2/2017 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1975 for5 , (csiku)
Related: [-] 5 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Konstantinos Stathis, Plaintiff Olga Panagos-Stathis
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
6 6 order Set Hearing Tue 01/17 12:53 PM
Order Scheduling Hearing On Motion For Default Judgment (Docket No.5 ) - Hearing to be held on 02/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1975. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2017
5 5 motion Default Judgment Mon 01/16 3:12 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiffs Olga Panagos-Stathis, Konstantinos Stathis (Schultz, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 01/10 8:31 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Investment-Retrievers, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 01/24/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2016
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 12/09 10:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on Investment-Retrievers, Inc 12/7/2016 (Schultz, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 12/07 1:40 PM
Summons Issued on Investment-Retrievers, Inc Answer Due 01/6/2017 (Schultz, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/07 1:40 PM
Adversary case 16-05111 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)): Complaint by Konstantinos Stathis, Olga Panagos-Stathis against Investment-Retrievers, Inc. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount of $ 350.00 is Exempt. (Schultz, Marshall)
Related: [-]