Scout Media Holdings, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13369
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13369
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Michael E Wiles |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-13424 |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Scout Media Holdings, Inc.
122 W 26th St Fl 5
New York, NY 10001-6804 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 12/07/2016 7:00 PM EST |
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 12/08 11:28 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-13424 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11602104. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 12/08 11:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 4/7/2017, Disclosure Statement due by 4/7/2017, Initial Case Conference due by 1/9/2017, Filed by Matthew P. Ward of Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP on behalf of Scout Media Holdings, Inc.. (Ward, Matthew) |