Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:William T Lawrence
Referred: Matthew P Brookman
Case #: 1:16-cv-03315
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2016
Terminated:Feb 03, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 06, 2017 4:56 AM EDT
Defendant
TOWN OF KNIGHTSTOWN, INDIANA
Represented By
Gregg H. Morelock
Brand & Morelock
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSEPH TOMPKINS
Represented By
Kenneth J. Falk
Aclu Of Indiana
contact info
Jan P. Mensz
Aclu Of Indiana
contact info

Docket last updated: 12/12/2016 12:42 PM EST
Thursday, December 08, 2016
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against TOWN OF KNIGHTSTOWN, INDIANA, filed by JOSEPH TOMPKINS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4157308)(Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Photograph Town Square,
Att: 2 Exhibit Photograph of tree,
Att: 3 Exhibit Photograph of tree (closer view),
Att: 4 Exhibit Photograph of top of tree,
Att: 5 Exhibit Photograph of top of tree,
Att: 6 Exhibit Photograph of lit cross,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth J. Falk on behalf of Plaintiff JOSEPH TOMPKINS. (Falk, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jan P. Mensz on behalf of Plaintiff JOSEPH TOMPKINS. (Mensz, Jan)
Related: [-]
4 4 Summons Issued as to TOWN OF KNIGHTSTOWN, INDIANA. (DJH)
Related: [-]
5 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
Related: [-]