Compulife Software, Inc. v. Newman et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Referred: | James M Hopkins |
Case #: | 9:16-cv-81942 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:0501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 02, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Jun 18, 2020 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday May 31, 2017 5:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Aaron Levy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Moses Newman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Binyomin Rutstein
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Rutstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Compulife Software, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
470 | 470
appeal
Transcript - Appeal
Tue 12/06 2:39 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2022 before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart, 1-35 pages, re:454 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, jemancari@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2023. (apz) |
|
469 | 469
appeal
Court Reporter Acknowledgment (PART II)
Tue 12/06 2:33 PM
TRANSCRIPT NOTIFICATION - Transcript ordered on: 9/15/2022 by Joel B. Rothman, Esq. has been filed by Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, jemancari@gmail.com re455 Transcript Information Form,468 Court Reporter Acknowledgment (apz) Modified text on 12/6/2022 (apz) |