Davis v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-17198 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Dec 12, 2016 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 10, 2017 4:12 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Terry Davis
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Inc.
Terminated: 02/07/2017
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global, Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer, Inc.
Terminated: 05/19/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Northstar RX, LLC
Terminated: 04/13/2017
|
|
Defendant
Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Terminated: 04/13/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 05/21 1:59 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/22 1:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Payton, Paige) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Taxotere Amended Complaint
Fri 05/19 12:23 AM
AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT by Terry Davis. Party Sanofi S.A. and Sanofi US Services Inc. added.(Bachus, Jere) Modified on 5/19/2017 (tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/11 8:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Apotex, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global, Inc..(tm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons | ||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Summons Issued
Mon 01/09 5:23 PM
Request of Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Apotex, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sun Pharma Global, Inc. filed by Terry Davis re1 Complaint,,.(Bachus, Jere) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons | ||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Wed 12/21 10:06 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER #1-6. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Friday, December 16, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 12/16 3:32 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint - Filing attorney incorrectly indexed party name - 'Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC'. When entering a party name, only the name of the party should be indexed. Any aliases should be added to the named party with the appropriate alias party role. Clerk took corrective action. (tm) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 12/15 8:43 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (am) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/12 8:42 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Apotex, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Eagle Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Hospira Worldwide, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Northstar RX, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sandoz, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, separately and d/b/a Winthrop U.S., Sun Pharma Global, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5850113) filed by Terry Davis.Attorney Jere Kyle Bachus added to party Terry Davis(pty:pla).(Bachus, Jere) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |