Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Referred: Andrew W Austin
Case #: 1:16-cv-01300
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2016
Re-opened:Jul 20, 2022
Terminated:Aug 23, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 10, 2017 5:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Dr. John Hellerstedt
Represented By
Todd Lawrence Disher
Office Of The Attorney General Of Texas
contact info
Craig Michael Warner
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
John S. Langley
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Alamo City Surgery Center PLLC
Represented By
Jan Soifer
Law Office
contact info
Stephanie Toti
Law Office Of Stephanie Toti
contact info
Molly Duane
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
David P. Brown
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
Patrick J. O'Connell
Law Offices Of Patrick J. O'Connell PLLC
contact info
J. Alexander Lawrence
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brookside Women's Medical Center PA
Represented By
Jan Soifer
Law Office
contact info
Stephanie Toti
Law Office Of Stephanie Toti
contact info
Molly Duane
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
David P. Brown
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
Patrick J. O'Connell
Law Offices Of Patrick J. O'Connell PLLC
contact info
J. Alexander Lawrence
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Lendol L. Davis, M.D.
Represented By
Jan Soifer
Law Office
contact info
Stephanie Toti
Law Office Of Stephanie Toti
contact info
Molly Duane
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
David P. Brown
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
Patrick J. O'Connell
Law Offices Of Patrick J. O'Connell PLLC
contact info
J. Alexander Lawrence
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nova Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Jan Soifer
Law Office
contact info
Stephanie Toti
Law Office Of Stephanie Toti
contact info
Molly Duane
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
David P. Brown
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
Patrick J. O'Connell
Law Offices Of Patrick J. O'Connell PLLC
contact info
J. Alexander Lawrence
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Whole Woman's Health
Represented By
Jan Soifer
Law Office
contact info
Stephanie Toti
Law Office Of Stephanie Toti
contact info
Molly Duane
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
David P. Brown
Center For Reproductive Rights
contact info
Patrick J. O'Connell
Law Offices Of Patrick J. O'Connell PLLC
contact info
J. Alexander Lawrence
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Movant
Jay Marcom
Terminated: 01/27/2017
124 E Walker Street
Breckenridge, TX 76424

GPO Jun 13 2018
ORDER DENYING Texas Catholic Conference of Bishops' Opposed 150 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (lt)
GPO Sep 05 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION INCORPORATING FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW DECLARING Texas Health and Safety Code § 697.001.004, 697.007.009 and the associated implementing rules codified at Title 25 of the Texas Administrative Code § 138.1.7 are VOID for violating the Due Process and Equal Protection Clauses of the Fourteenth Amendment of the United States Constitution. The Court also ENTERS A PERMANENT INJUNCTION prohibiting Defendant Charles Smith, in his official capacity as the Executive Commissioner of the Texas Health and Human Services Commission, from enforcing Texas Health and Safety Code § 697.001.004, 697.007.009 and the associated implementing rules codified at Title 25 of the Texas Administrative Code § 138.l.7. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (lt)
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
277 277 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/24 12:52 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. All parties shall bear their own fees and costs. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (klw)
Related: [-]
276 276 minutes Status Conference Wed 08/24 12:00 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Status Conference held on 8/23/2022. Written Order to follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Angela Hailey.)(klw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
275 275 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 08/17 9:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Alamo City Surgery Center PLLC, Brookside Women's Medical Center PA, Lendol L. Davis, MD, Bhavik Kumar, Whole Woman's Health, Whole Woman's Health Alliance. (Rodriguez, Juanluis)
Related: [-]