New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alison J Nathan
Case #: 1:16-cv-09608
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Sex Discrimination
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2016
Terminated:Jun 04, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jun 11, 2017 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Fox Entertainment Group LLC
Represented By
Linda Ceilia Goldstein
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jamie Rachel Hacker
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Nicolle Lipper Jacoby
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Andrew J. Levander
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Diana Chaofan Wang
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Fox Television Stations, LLC
Represented By
Linda Ceilia Goldstein
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jamie Rachel Hacker
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Nicolle Lipper Jacoby
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Andrew J. Levander
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Diana Chaofan Wang
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Byron Harmon
Represented By
Linda Ceilia Goldstein
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jamie Rachel Hacker
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Nicolle Lipper Jacoby
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Andrew J. Levander
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Diana Chaofan Wang
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.
Represented By
Linda Ceilia Goldstein
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Jamie Rachel Hacker
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Nicolle Lipper Jacoby
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Andrew J. Levander
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Diana Chaofan Wang
Dechert, Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Lidija Ujkic
Represented By
Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Michael John Willemin
Wigdor LLP
contact info
Douglas Holden Wigdor
Wigdor LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
71 71 misc Sealed Document Disposed Mon 04/15 2:21 PM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 29 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 04/15/2024..(jus)
Related: [-]