Texas Western District Court
Judge:Sam Sparks
Case #: 1:16-cv-01308
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Dec 13, 2016
Terminated:Aug 15, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Jun 11, 2017 3:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Oscar Martinez Sustaita
124 Rolling Oak Dr.
Elgin, TX 78621
Represented By
Ricardo Guzman
Law Office Of Rick Guzman, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
STA Granite Solutions LLC
Represented By
Ricardo Guzman
Law Office Of Rick Guzman, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Alfredo Borja
Represented By
Anna Bocchini
Equal Justice Center
contact info
Philip Jonathan Moss
Equal Justice Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
13 13 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 08/15 4:21 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
12 12 motion Dismiss Mon 08/14 9:24 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to settlement by Jose Alfredo Borja.(Bocchini, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 03, 2017
11 11 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/03 4:25 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Jose Alfredo Borja. (Bocchini, Anna)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/03 2:37 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Oscar Martinez Sustaita, STA Granite Solutions LLC. (Guzman, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/16 12:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Docket Call set for 12/21/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks, ADR Report Deadline due by 6/23/2017, Amended Pleadings due by 5/19/2017, Discovery due by 7/28/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 5/19/2017, Motions due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
8 8 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 03/13 11:37 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order and Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Oscar Martinez Sustaita, STA Granite Solutions LLC.(Guzman, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Proposed Scheduling Order
Friday, March 10, 2017
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 03/10 2:49 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by STA Granite Solutions LLC. (Guzman, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 01/26 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Guzman on behalf of Oscar Martinez Sustaita, STA Granite Solutions LLC. Attorney Ricardo Guzman added to party Oscar Martinez Sustaita(pty:dft), Attorney Ricardo Guzman added to party STA Granite Solutions LLC(pty:dft) (Guzman, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2017
5 5 order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Thu 01/19 4:18 PM
ORDERED that the parties confer and submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration by March 17, 2017, pursuant to Local Rule CV-16(c). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (td)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/18 10:20 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Oscar Martinez Sustaita.(td)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 12/14 8:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Oscar Martinez Sustaita, STA Granite Solutions LLC. (afd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2016
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 12/13 1:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jose Alfredo Borja.(Bocchini, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 12/13 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9117290), filed by Jose Alfredo Borja.(Bocchini, Anna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 12/13 4:04 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
Related: [-]