Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:16-bk-09391
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Patel 2601 Realty, LLC
2601 State St
Columbus, IN 47201-7445
Represented By
David R. Krebs
Hester Baker Krebs LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
17 17 motion Dismiss Case, Motion to Wed 4:32 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case filed by James G. Lauck on behalf of Creditor Old National Bank. (Lauck, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Tue 1:33 PM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Submission, filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Debtor Patel 2601 Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 notice Notice of Submission Tue 12:01 PM
Notice of Submission of Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Debtor Patel 2601 Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-] 4
14 14 notice Objection Notice (must be reviewed & approved by Court before filing) Tue 11:48 AM
Objection Notice with Certificate of Service re: Application to Employ, filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Debtor Patel 2601 Realty, LLC Related [+]. Objections due by 02/07/2017. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, January 16, 2017
13 13 motion Employ, Application to Mon 2:26 PM
Application to Employ Hester Baker Krebs LLC as Debtor's Attorney and Set Procedure for Draw on Retainer (Verified Statement attached), filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Debtor Patel 2601 Realty, LLC. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
12 12 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Documents Wed 3:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statement of Affairs, Small Business Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations and Tax Return, Income & Expense Schedule, Statement of Currently Monthly Income and List of Equity Security Holders and Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. Incomplete Filings due by 1/31/2017. (hhd)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
11 11 motion Extend Time to File Initial Documents (Schedules, Plan, Pay Advices, Etc.), Motion to Tue 2:49 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statement of Affairs, Small Business Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations and Tax Return, Income & Expense Schedule, Statement of Currently Monthly Income and List of Equity Security Holders and Attorney Disclosure of Compensation filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Debtor Patel 2601 Realty, LLC Related [+]. Certificate of Service attached. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
10 10 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Documents Wed 2:36 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statement of Affairs, Small Business Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations and Tax Return, Income & Expense Schedule, Statement of Currently Monthly Income, List of Equity Security Holders and Attorney Disclosure of Compensation Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. Incomplete Filings due by 1/10/2017. (jlh)
Related: [-] 9
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
9 9 motion Extend Time to File Initial Documents (Schedules, Plan, Pay Advices, Etc.), Motion to Tue 2:06 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Statement of Affairs, Small Business Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations and Tax Return, Income & Expense Schedule, Statement of Currently Monthly Income, List of Equity Security Holders and Attorney Disclosure of Compensation filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Debtor Patel 2601 Realty, LLC Related [+]. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-] 1
8 8 notice Appearance Tue 10:23 AM
Appearance filed by James G. Lauck on behalf of Creditor Old National Bank. (Lauck, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Tue 10:22 AM
Appearance filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Creditor Old National Bank. (Means, Harley)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2016
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice Sun 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - 341 MEETING NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 8 Notice Date 12/17/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4
Friday, December 16, 2016
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sat 12:56 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 12/16/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, December 15, 2016
4 4 court 341 Meeting Notice - Ch 11 Thu 3:08 PM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 1/17/2017 at 11:00 AM EST in Rm 416B U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Objections to Dischargeability due by 3/20/2017. (lad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
3 3 misc Secured Creditor List (Chapter 11 Cases) Wed 10:02 AM
List of Secured Creditors filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Debtor Patel 2601 Realty, LLC. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 9:42 AM
Appearance filed by Jeannette Eisan Hinshaw on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Hinshaw, Jeannette)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Wed 8:45 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with Corporate Ownership Statement, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors and Verification of Creditor List filed by David R. Krebs on behalf of Patel 2601 Realty, LLC. List of Secured Creditors due by 12/21/2016. Income & Expense Schedule due by 12/28/2016. Small Business Balance Sheet due by 12/21/2016. Small Business Cash Flow Statement due by 12/21/2016. Small Business Statement of Operations due by 12/21/2016. Small Business Tax Return due by 12/21/2016. Statement of Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) due by 12/28/2016. List of Equity Security Holders due by 12/28/2016. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation due by 12/28/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs with Declaration due by 12/28/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities with Declaration due by 12/28/2016. Schedule A/B with Declaration due by 12/28/2016. Schedule D with Declaration due by 12/28/2016. Schedule E/F with Declaration due by 12/28/2016. Schedule G with Declaration due by 12/28/2016. Schedule H with Declaration due by 12/28/2016. (Krebs, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 8:48 AM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 16-09391 11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26675121. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
court Judge - Terminate/Add Wed 9:02 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Graham assigned. (see)
Related: [-]