35
|
|
35
order
oWaive
Thu 12/14 9:26 AM
Stipulated ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion for Waiver of Discharge and Denying Discharge Related [+] signed on 12/14/2017 . (Vargas, Rosario)
|
|
|
court
Close Adversary
Thu 12/14 9:29 AM
Adversary Terminated . (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Wed 12/13 4:25 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Waiver of Discharge and Denying Discharge filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE Related [+].(BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A
|
33
|
|
33
motion
Waive (Motion to)
Wed 12/13 4:23 PM
Stipulated Motion to Waive Discharge filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE. (BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
order
oWithdraw as Attorney
Wed 12/13 2:37 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Related [+] signed on 12/13/2017 . (Vargas, Rosario)
|
31
|
|
31
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Wed 12/13 1:57 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Debtor/Defendant Yomtov "Scott" Menaged filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+]. (JESS, CODY)
|
30
|
|
30
motion
Withdraw as Attorney (Motion to)
Wed 12/13 1:54 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Debtor/Defendant Yomtov "Scott" Menaged filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED. (JESS, CODY)
Related: [-]
|
29
|
|
29
order
oStipulated Order
Thu 10/05 12:03 PM
Stipulated Order re: Joint Discovery Plan signed on 10/5/2017 . (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Wed 10/04 1:59 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order //Stipulated Order Re: Joint Discovery Plan filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE. (BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
order
oStipulated Order
Fri 06/30 3:35 PM
Stipulated Order re: Joint Discovery Plan signed on 6/30/2017 Related [+] . (Vargas, Rosario)
|
26
|
|
26
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Fri 06/30 2:25 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Stipulated Order re: Joint Discovery Plan filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+]. (JESS, CODY)
|
25
|
|
25
notice
Substitution of Attorney (Notice of)
Fri 06/30 11:34 AM
Notice of Substitution of Attorney filed by EDWARD K. BERNATAVICIUS of UNITED STATES TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE.(BERNATAVICIUS, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
order
oStipulated Order
Mon 06/12 9:55 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Initial Disclosure Deadline signed on 6/12/2017 Related [+] . (Vargas, Rosario)
|
23
|
|
23
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Fri 06/09 10:34 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Stipulated Order Extending Initial Disclosure Deadline filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+]. (JESS, CODY)
|
22
|
|
22
audio
Thu 05/18 2:20 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 05/17/2017 11:00 AM ]. File Size [ 1,461 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:07 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1370360)).(Orosco, Leticia)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
vCal
Minute Entry
Wed 05/17 11:26 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 05/17/2017
Subject: RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE.
(vCal Hearing ID (1370360)). Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/17/2018 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS), (Beller, Luann)
|
20
|
|
20
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 05/10 2:53 PM
Notice of Filing Joint Discovery Plan filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE. (GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Wed 04/12 10:07 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
|
18
|
|
18
order
oSetting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Form (PS)
Mon 04/10 7:50 AM
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference and Procedures Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2017 at 11:00 AM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) . (Beller, Luann)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/05 4:50 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+]. (JESS, CODY)
|
16
|
|
16
order
oDismiss Complaint
Wed 03/22 1:49 PM
ORDER Denying Motion to Dismiss Complaint Related [+] signed on 3/22/2017 . (Vargas, Rosario)
|
15
|
|
15
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Wed 03/22 12:26 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss United States Trustee's Complaint to Deny Discharge Under 11 U.S.C. Section 727 filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE Related [+]. (GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
|
14
|
|
14
audio
Wed 03/22 8:50 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 03/21/2017 01:30 PM ]. File Size [ 29,994 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:03:59 ]. (vCal Hearing ID (1362587)).(Orosco, Leticia)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
vCal
Minute Entry
Tue 03/21 2:57 PM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/21/2017
Subject: DEFENDANT YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT TO DENY DISCHARGEABILITY.
(vCal Hearing ID (1362587)). Related [+] (Beller, Luann)
|
12
|
|
12
answer
Reply
Tue 02/14 3:01 PM
Reply to Motion/Application Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss United States Trustee's Complaint to Deny Dischargeability Under 11 U.S.C. Section 727 Related [+] filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED. (JESS, CODY)
|
11
|
|
11
answer
Response
Tue 01/31 5:23 PM
Response to Motion/Application to Dismiss Complaint Related [+] filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE. (GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
|
10
|
|
10
notice
Hearing on Motion (Notice of)
Wed 01/18 1:36 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss United States Trustee's Complaint to Deny Dischargeability Under 11 U.S.C. Section 727 filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+] Hearing on Motion set for 3/21/2017 at 01:30 PM at 230 N. First Ave., 6th Floor, Courtroom 601, Phoenix, AZ (PS) Objections/Responses due by 1/31/2017,. (JESS, CODY)
|
9
|
|
9
order
oExceed Page Limit
Tue 01/17 4:12 PM
ORDER Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit Related [+] signed on 1/17/2017 . (Vargas, Rosario)
|
8
|
|
8
motion
Dismiss Complaint (Motion to)
Tue 01/17 3:49 PM
Motion to Dismiss Complaint Motion to Dismiss United States Trustee's Complaint to Deny Dischargeability Under 11 U.S.C. Section 727 filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+]. (JESS, CODY)
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit 2
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit 3
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit 4
|
| |
Att: 5
Exhibit 5
|
| |
Att: 6
Exhibit 6
|
| |
Att: 7
Exhibit 7
|
| |
Att: 8
Exhibit 8
|
| |
Att: 9
Exhibit 9
|
| |
Att: 10
Exhibit 10
|
| |
Att: 11
Exhibit 11
|
| |
Att: 12
Exhibit 12
|
| |
Att: 13
Exhibit 13
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)
Tue 01/17 3:33 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+]. (JESS, CODY)
|
6
|
|
6
motion
Exceed Page Limit (Motion to)
Tue 01/17 3:31 PM
Motion to Exceed Page Limit re: Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Complaint filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED. (JESS, CODY)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
other
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/15 10:46 AM
Certificate of Service filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE. Related [+] (GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
|
4
|
|
4
court
Summons Issued (Form)
Thu 12/15 9:45 AM
Summons Issued . (Vargas, Rosario)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
cmp
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 12/14 2:08 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE. (GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
cmp
Complaint (Includes a Section 727 Objection to Discharge) (No Fee Due or Fee Deferred)
Wed 12/14 1:35 PM
Complaint (No Fee Due/Deferred - Section 727) against YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED filed by JENNIFER A. GIAIMO of OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE on behalf of US TRUSTEE. (GIAIMO, JENNIFER)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
notice
Appearance in Adversary Proceeding (Notice of)
Wed 12/14 10:01 AM
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by CODY J. JESS of SCHIAN WALKER, PLC on behalf of YOMTOV SCOTT MENAGED Related [+]. (JESS, CODY)
Related: [-] Adversary Proceeding Opened
|