Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:16-bk-36390
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2016
Terminated:Apr 20, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Stone Energy Corporation
625 E. Kaliste Saloom Rd.
Lafayette, LA 70508
Represented By
Aaron James Power
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Caroline A. Reckler
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Christopher Richard Harris
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
David S Heller
Latham & Watkins
contact info
Matthew L Warren
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Joshua W. Wolfshohl
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
John F Higgins, IV
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Josef S Athanas
Lathan & Watkins LLP
contact info
Blake T Denton
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Oct 20, 2017 8:05 AM CDT
Attorney
Porter Hedges LLP
Creditor
Nexen Petroleum Offshore U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By
Mitchell E Ayer
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
Seitel Data, Ltd.
Strasburger & Price, LLP 720 Brazos Suite 700
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Duane J Brescia
Strasburger & Price LLP
contact info
Creditor
Seismic Exchange, Inc.
Jackson Walker L.L.P. c/o Bruce J. Ruzinsky 1401 McKinney, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010
Represented By
Jennifer F Wertz
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Bruce J. Ruzinsky
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Keith A. Seilhan
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Red Willow Offshore, LLC
712 Main Street Suite 1610
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Barnet B Skelton, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Creditor
PRA Receivables Management, LLC
PO Box 41021
Norfolk, VA 23541
Creditor
Odyssea Marine, Inc.
Represented By
Robin B Cheatham
Adams Reese LLP
contact info
Creditor
Noble Energy, Inc.
Represented By
Demetra L Liggins
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sheldon Independent School District
Represented By
Owen Mark Sonik
Perdue Brandon Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Mississippi Department of Revenue
Legal Division Post Office Box 22828
Jackson, MS 39225
Represented By
James L Powell
Mississippi Department Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Thomas L. Messonnier
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Marubeni Oil & Gas (USA), Inc.
Adams and Reese LLP 701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500
New Orleans, LA 70139
Represented By
Robin B Cheatham
Adams Reese LLP
contact info
Creditor
Marubeni Eagle Ford, LP
Represented By
Robin B Cheatham
Adams Reese LLP
contact info
Creditor
Louisiana Department of Revenue
Baton Rouge, LA 70896
Represented By
Florence Bonaccorso-Saenz
Louisiana Dept Of Revenue
contact info
Creditor
Lexon Insurance Company
ATTN: Philip Eisenberg 600 Travis Street, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Philip G Eisenberg
Locke Lord Et Al
contact info
Creditor
John J. Leonard
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Eldon J. Louviere
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
State of Louisiana, Department of Natural Resources, OMR
Represented By
Ryan Michael Seidemann
Louisiana Department Of Justice
contact info
Creditor
TGS-NOPEC Geophysical Company
10451 Clay Road
Houston, TX 77041
Represented By
Margaret Virginia Glass
Geiger Laborde Laperouse LLC
contact info
Andrew A Braun
Gieger Laborde Et Al
contact info
Creditor
TH Exploration III, LLC
Represented By
Bradley Roland Foxman
Vinson Elkins
contact info
Creditor
Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC
10953 Vista Lake Ct.
Navasota, TX 77868
Represented By
Patricia Williams Prewitt
Law Office Of Patricia Williams Prewitt
contact info
Creditor
The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By
Thomas Pitta
Emmett Marvin Et Al.
contact info
Edward P. Zjukowski
Emmett, Martin Et Al.
contact info
William Patrick, III
Heller Draper Et Al
contact info
Tristan E Manthey
Heller Draper Patrick & Horn, L.L.C.
contact info
Creditor
The Louisiana Land and Exploration Company LLC
c/o Bradley C. Knapp 601 Poydras Street Suite 2660
New Orleans, LA 70130
Represented By
Bradley Clay Knapp
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Richard L. Toothman, Jr.
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Triad Hunter LLC
Represented By
Michelle E Shriro
Singer & Levick PC
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
ATTN: Philip Eisenberg 600 Travis Street, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Philip G Eisenberg
Locke Lord Et Al
contact info
Creditor
United States of America
Represented By
Leah Victoria Lerman
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Richard A. Kincheloe
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Creditor
W-Industries of Louisiana, LLC
P. O. Box 82438
Lafayette, LA 70598
Represented By
John A Mouton, III
Law Offices Of John A Mouton, Iii
contact info
Creditor
David H. Welch
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Williams Ohio Valley Midstream, LLC
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, et al. 320 South Boston Avenue Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74103
Represented By
Steven W Soule
Hall Estill Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Wilson County
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Groggan Blair Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Florence M. Zeigler
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Kenneth H. Beer
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks Independent School District
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP Attn: Tara L. Grundemeier Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair And Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
ENI Petroleum Co Inc
1200 Smith Street Suite 1707
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Jonathan L. Lozano
Bracewell LLP
contact info
Jason Gary Cohen
Bracewell LLP
contact info
Creditor
ConocoPhillips Company
c/o Bradley C. Knapp 601 Poydras Street Suite 2660
New Orleans, LA 70130
Represented By
Bradley Clay Knapp
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Cass County
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott PO Box 2007
Tyler, TX 75710
Represented By
Tab Beall
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP
c/o Bradley C. Knapp 601 Poydras Street Suite 2660
New Orleans, LA 70130
Represented By
Bradley Clay Knapp
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bristow U.S., LLC
4605 Industrial Dr.
New Iberia, LA 70560
Represented By
H Kent Aguillard
Attorney At Law
contact info
Creditor
Fairfield Industries Incorporated
Thompson & Knight LLP 333 Clay St., Suite 3300
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Mitchell E Ayer
Thompson & Knight LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fieldwood Energy LLC
Represented By
Brian A Kilmer
Kilmer Crosby & Walker PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Geophyiscal Pursuit, Inc.
Jackson Walker LLP 1401 McKinney Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010
Represented By
Jennifer F Wertz
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Bruce J. Ruzinsky
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair And Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
George A Davis
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Suzanne S Uhland
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel S. Shamah
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Michael Francis Lotito
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Sean B Davis
Winstead PC
contact info
Creditor
Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co.
Hall, Estill, Hardwick, et al. 320 South Boston Avenue Suite 200
Tulsa, OK 74103
Represented By
Steven W Soule
Hall Estill Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Hunt Oil Company
1717 Main Street Suite 4200
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Mark Edward Andrews
Dykema Cox Smith
contact info
Creditor
Archrock Partners Operating, L.L.C.
16666 North Chase Dr.
Houston, TX 77060
Represented By
Kevin M Maraist
Anderson Lehrman Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Apache Corporation
Represented By
John P Melko
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Michael Kevin Riordan
Gardere Wynne Sewell LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Noteholders
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP 1700 Pacific Avenue Suite 4100
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
David M. Zensky
Akim Gump Et Al
contact info
Antonio Delgado
Akin Gump
contact info
Kevin Zuzolo
Akin Gump Et Al
contact info
Michael S Stamer
Akin Gump Et Al
contact info
Charles R Gibbs
Akin Gump Et Al
contact info
Meredith A. Lahaie
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Creditor
ALDINE INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
2520 W.W. Thorne Drive
Houston, TX 77073
Represented By
Brittanye Lashay Morris
Mackie Wolf Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
ATTN: Philip Eisenberg 600 Travis Street, Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Philip G Eisenberg
Locke Lord Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Lisa S. Jaubert
Represented By
Michael D Warner
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
EQT Production Company
Represented By
Bradley Thomas Giordano
Kirkland Ellis LLP
contact info
Stephen T. Schwarzbach, Jr.
Kirkland & Ellis
contact info
Interested Party
Jackson Walker LLP
1401 McKinney St Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010
Represented By
Matthew D Cavenaugh
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Interested Party
A2D Technologies, Inc., d/b/a TGS Geological Products and Services
785 Greens Parkway Suite 100
Houston, TX 77067
Represented By
Margaret Virginia Glass
Geiger Laborde Laperouse LLC
contact info
Andrew A Braun
Gieger Laborde Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
WesternGeco, L.L.C.
10001 Richmond Ave
Houston, TX 77042
Represented By
Margaret Virginia Glass
Geiger Laborde Laperouse LLC
contact info
Andrew A Braun
Gieger Laborde Et Al
contact info
Sarah P LaFantano
Alston Bird LLP
contact info
Jason D Rosenberg
Alston Bird LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Elizabeth Maduzia
4416 Snowcloud Court
Concord, CA 94518
Interested Party
Sonia Chae United States Securities & Exchange Commission
Chicago Regional Office 175 W. Jackson Blvd. Suite 900
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
Sonia Anne Chae
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Interested Party
Union Pacific Railroad Co
1400 Douglas St, Stop 1580
Omaha, NE 68179
Interested Party
MarkWest Liberty Midstream & Resources LLC
Represented By
Brian Patrick Gaffney
Snell Wilmer LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Independent Directors of the Board of Stone Energy Corporation
600 Travis Suite 4200
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Robin Russell
Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Helix Well Containment Group
Marathon Tower 5555 San Felipe, Ste 1625
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Thomas M Kirkendall
Attorney At Law
contact info
Interested Party
Multi Kient Invest As
Represented By
Margaret Virginia Glass
Geiger Laborde Laperouse LLC
contact info
Andrew A Braun
Gieger Laborde Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By
Charles A Beckham, Jr
Haynes & Boone
contact info
Interested Party
TGS-NPEC Geophysical Company ASA
10451 Clay Road
Houston, TX 77043
Represented By
Margaret Virginia Glass
Geiger Laborde Laperouse LLC
contact info
Andrew A Braun
Gieger Laborde Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
EQT Corporation
Represented By
Bradley Thomas Giordano
Kirkland Ellis LLP
contact info
Stephen T. Schwarzbach, Jr.
Kirkland & Ellis
contact info
Other Prof.
Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By
John James Sparacino
Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 757 Third Ave Third Floor
New York, NY 10017
Stockholder
Ad Hoc Committee of Stone Energy Shareholders
Represented By
Victor Noskov
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
David Gerger
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Emily McLemore Smith
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Benjamin I Finestone
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Et Al
contact info
K John Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Christine A March
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago
Saturday, March 28, 2020
600 600 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/28 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 50. Notice Date 03/28/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 599 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form)
Thursday, March 26, 2020
599 599 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (Form) Thu 03/26 7:54 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to598 Transcript. Parties notified Related [+] (Olin)
Related: [-] 598 Transcript
Wednesday, March 25, 2020
598 598 12 pgs court Transcript Wed 03/25 8:35 PM
Transcript RE: HEARING ON APPLICATIONS FOR COMPENSATION and MOTION FOR FINAL DECREE held on 4-20-17 before Judge Marvin Isgur. Transcript is available for viewing in the Clerk's Office. Filed by Transcript access will be restricted through 06/23/2020. (gree)
Related: [-]