Gracious (IP) LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13500
Lead case is: 1:16-bk-13500
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Lisa G Beckerman |
Case #: | 1:16-bk-13506 |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Gracious (IP) LLC
1201 3rd Ave
New York, NY 10021-5401 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 12/13/2016 7:00 PM EST |
Wednesday, December 14, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Wed 12/14 9:39 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 16-13506 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11610676. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 12/14 9:37 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Incomplete Filings due by 12/28/2016, Filed by Joseph J. DiPasquale of Trenk, DiPasquale et. al. on behalf of Gracious (IP) LLC. (DiPasquale, Joseph) |