California Northern District Court
Judge:Lucy H Koh
Case #: 3:16-cv-07154
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Dec 14, 2016
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2017 1:42 AM PDT
Defendant
Yahoo Inc.
Represented By
Ann Marie Mortimer
Hunton & Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Vail
Represented By
Lee Adam Cirsch
Capstone Law, Apc
contact info
Robert Kenneth Friedl
Capstone Law Apc
contact info
Trisha Kathleen Monesi
Capstone Law Apc
contact info


1. Yahoo Failed to Protect Consumers From Hacking, Lawsuit Says (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Thu 12/15/2016
Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 14, 2016
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Wed 12/14 9:14 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Amy Vail (Cirsch, Lee) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 12/14 9:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Yahoo Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11007734.). Filed byAmy Vail.(Cirsch, Lee) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons