Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-51569
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016
Terminated:Apr 03, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aryzta LLC
Represented By
Aryzta LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfield
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, June 09, 2017
9 9 notice Settlement - Notice Fri 06/09 2:25 PM
Notice of Settlement of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Settlement Procedures Order Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
8 8 notice Settlement - Notice Thu 04/27 3:12 PM
Notice of Settlement of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Settlement Procedures Order Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/03 11:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51569 Closed (MAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
7 7 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 03/31 4:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
6 6 order Order Wed 02/22 10:41 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total In Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 2/21/2017 (MAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 02/17 9:31 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Wed 02/01 2:59 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 01/09 3:57 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Aryzta LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/10/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, December 16, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 12/16 9:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51569 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8274759, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 12/16 11:43 AM
Adversary case 16-51569 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against Aryzta LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/16/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 ADR Notice