Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-51576
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016
Terminated:Apr 04, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
72AndSunny Partners
Represented By
72AndSunny Partners
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfield
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/04 9:55 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51576 Closed (MAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2017
9 9 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Fri 03/31 3:02 PM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Second Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Related [+]. Signed on 3/31/2017. (SJS)
Related: [-] 7 ,8
Thursday, March 30, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection(Adv) Thu 03/30 1:56 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Plaintiff's Second Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Related [+] Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
7 7 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Wed 03/08 1:59 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Plaintiff's Second Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/27/2017 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 3/28/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
6 6 order Order Wed 02/22 10:41 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total In Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Signed on 2/21/2017 (MAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 02/17 9:31 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Wed 02/01 2:59 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 01/09 5:37 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant 72AndSunny Partners. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/10/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, December 16, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 12/16 9:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51576 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8274759, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 12/16 12:03 PM
Adversary case 16-51576 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against 72AndSunny Partners. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/16/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 ADR Notice