Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-16702

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Magdeline D Coleman
Case #: 2:16-ap-00447
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2016
Terminated:Dec 06, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Marc S. Antonucci
3525 Wellsford Lane
Doylestown, PA 18902
Represented By
Marc S. Antonucci
contact info
Plaintiff
Provident Bank
Represented By
PRINCE ALTEE THOMAS
Fox, Rothschild, O'Brien & Frankel
contact info

GPO Jul 25 2019
Order that Judgement is entered in favor of Provident in the Nondischargeability Action. The Debtor is Denied a Discharge Pursuant to 11 USC 727(a)(2). The Court shall hold a Status Hearing on the Lien Avoidance Motion with respect to the remaining issues for disposition, as set forth in the Memorandum, on September 4, 2019 at 10:30 am in Bankruptcy Court No. 2, United States Bankruptcy Court, 900 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA (related document(s) 1, 21). (H., Lisa) *Modified on 7/26/2019 to correct linkage number to memorandum* (H., Lisa).

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, December 06, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/06 2:15 PM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-447 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (B., Keith)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 11/21 8:33 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:16-ap-447 Judgement/Denial of Discharge and Main Case Dismissed Related [+]. (H., Lisa)
Related: [-] 1
Sunday, July 28, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 07/29 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #23 )
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 07/29 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/28/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #22 )
Friday, July 26, 2019
23 23 court Attach PDF Document Fri 07/26 9:46 AM
Corrective Entry Re: Memorandum Related [+]. *Modified Entry To Attach PDF* (H., Lisa)
Related: [-] 21
Thursday, July 25, 2019
22 22 order WO Order (Generic) Fri 07/26 9:39 AM
Order that Judgement is entered in favor of Provident in the Nondischargeability Action. The Debtor is Denied a Discharge Pursuant to 11 USC 727(a)(2). The Court shall hold a Status Hearing on the Lien Avoidance Motion with respect to the remaining issues for disposition, as set forth in the Memorandum, on September 4, 2019 at 10:30 am in Bankruptcy Court No. 2, United States Bankruptcy Court, 900 Market Street, Philadelphia, PA Related [+]. (H., Lisa) *Modified on 7/26/2019 to correct linkage number to memorandum* (H., Lisa)
Related: [-] 1 ,21
21 21 19 pgs court Memorandum (without order) Fri 07/26 9:17 AM
Memorandum. For the reasons stated, the Court finds Provident has established that the Debtor is not entitled to a general discharge pursuant to §727(a)(2), and therefore will rule in favor of Provident in the Nondischargeability Action. With respect to the Lien Avoidance Motion, the Court will allow the Parties the opportunity to address the legal issue of whether the denial of the Debtors discharge precludes the Debtor from avoiding Providents judgment lien. Related [+]. The Court will Enter Judgment in favor of Provident in the Nondischargeability Action and set a status hearing for further proceedings on the Lien Avoidance Motion (H., Lisa) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019 (H., Lisa)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, March 15, 2018
20 20 misc Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Thu 03/15 4:36 PM
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Filed by JON M. ADELSTEIN on behalf of Marc S. Antonucci. (ADELSTEIN, JON)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Brief Thu 03/15 3:40 PM
Brief Proposed Findings of Fact and Consusions of Law and Supporting Memorandum Filed by PRINCE ALTEE THOMAS on behalf of Provident Bank Related [+]. (THOMAS, PRINCE)
Related: [-] 17
Att: 1 Certification of Service
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
18 18 court Transcript Wed 02/07 8:04 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on January 22, 2018, prepared by Reliable, 142 pages. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/13/2018. Redaction Request Due By 2/27/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/9/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/7/2018. (L., Linda)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, January 22, 2018
17 17 court Trial Held Tue 01/23 1:41 PM
Evidentiary Trial Held and Concluded Related [+] Proposed findings and conclusions due by 3/15/18 - HELD UNDER ADVISEMENT (G., Eileen)
Related: [-] ,15
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trial Thu 11/23 1:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trial. Number of Notices Mailed: Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #15 )
Monday, November 20, 2017
15 15 court Trial Mon 11/20 10:58 AM
Trial Related [+]RE-scheduled 1/22/2018 at 10:30 AM at nix2 - Courtroom #2. (G., Eileen)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, September 08, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trial Sat 09/09 1:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Trial. Number of Notices Mailed: Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #13 )
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
13 13 court Trial Wed 09/06 11:43 AM
Trial Related [+] scheduled 11/27/2017 at 10:30 AM at nix2 - Courtroom #2. (G., Eileen)
Related: [-] 1
12 12 court Hearing Held Wed 09/06 11:42 AM
Pre-Trial Hearing Held on Adversary - Trial scheduled for 11/27/16 @ 10:30 a.m (G., Eileen)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
11 11 misc Pre-Trial Statement (Joint ) Mon 08/14 3:13 PM
Joint Pre-Trial Statement Filed by PRINCE ALTEE THOMAS on behalf of Provident Bank. (THOMAS, PRINCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2017
10 10 court Document Thu 07/06 2:58 PM
Document in re: Defendant's Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures Filed by JON M. ADELSTEIN on behalf of Marc S. Antonucci Related [+]. (ADELSTEIN, JON)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
9 9 court Document Wed 06/28 4:24 PM
Document in re: Plaintiff's Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7026(a)(3) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(3) Filed by PRINCE ALTEE THOMAS on behalf of Provident Bank. (THOMAS, PRINCE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
8 8 misc Mediation Declined Wed 03/08 11:09 AM
Mediation declined Filed by PRINCE ALTEE THOMAS on behalf of Marc S. Antonucci, Provident Bank. (THOMAS, PRINCE)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 02/18 1:02 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
6 6 order Pre-Trial Order Wed 02/15 1:27 PM
Pre-Trial Order. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 9/6/2017 at 11:00 AM at nix2 - Courtroom #2. Joint Pre-Trial Statement due by 8/14/2017. Motions Due by 8/14/2017. Discovery due by 5/16/2017. (R., Donna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
5 5 answer Response Wed 01/18 3:54 PM
Response to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Provident Bank Filed by Marc S. Antonucci Related [+]. (ADELSTEIN, JON)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/03 8:29 AM
Amended Summons Service Executed on Marc S. Antonucci 12/19/2016 . (THOMAS, PRINCE)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/19 11:16 AM
Summons Service Executed on Marc S. Antonucci 12/19/2016 . (THOMAS, PRINCE)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 12/19 10:19 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Marc S. Antonucci Date Issued 12/19/2016, Answer Due 1/18/2017. (S., Antoinette)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/16 11:00 AM
Adversary case 16-00447 Complaint by PRINCE ALTEE THOMAS on behalf of Provident Bank against Marc S. Antonucci. Fee Amount $350 Objecting to Discharge of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a), 523(a) and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 4004 and 7001 . (65 (Dischargeability - other)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (THOMAS, PRINCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E