Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-51671
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2016
Terminated:Mar 31, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
AT & T
Represented By
AT & T
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, March 31, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/31 10:47 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51671 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2017
6 6 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 03/30 11:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
5 5 order Order Wed 02/22 8:12 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 02/17 9:31 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
3 3 motion Approve - Motion Wed 02/01 2:59 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 12/19 4:03 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51671 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8276834, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 12/19 11:48 AM
Adversary case 16-51671 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against AT & T. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/20/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 ADR Notice