Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-51742
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 19, 2016
Terminated:May 17, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ponder LLC
Represented By
Ponder LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/17 10:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51742 Closed (MAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
7 7 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 05/16 3:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
6 6 order Order Wed 02/22 8:32 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 02/17 10:42 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Wed 02/01 3:44 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 01/11 7:08 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Ponder LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/13/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 12/20 8:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51742 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8277332, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2016
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 12/19 4:43 PM
Adversary case 16-51742 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against Ponder LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/20/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 ADR Notice