Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-51796
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Terminated:Sep 25, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By
Colgate-Palmolive Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, September 25, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/25 11:28 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51796 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2017
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 09/22 2:39 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,8 Filed by Peter S. Kravitz, Esq.. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2017
14 14 mediation Conflict Review Fri 08/18 1:12 PM
Conflict Review Pursuant to Local Rule 9019-2(e)(iii)(B) (Haber, Eric)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 12, 2017
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/13 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, August 10, 2017
12 12 court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Thu 08/10 1:21 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Eric Haber is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 8/10/2017. (LCN)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
11 11 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Tue 08/08 2:39 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Peter S. Kravitz, Esq. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
10 10 notice Name Change - Notice Fri 06/30 4:59 PM
Notice of Name Change of Plaintiff Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 06/08 1:37 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement pursuant to F.R.B.P. 7007.1(a) Filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company. (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 04/12 12:16 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company Mediation due date: 08/10/2017.(Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
7 7 notice Appearance - Notice Wed 04/12 12:13 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company (Tobia, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
6 6 order Order Wed 02/22 8:16 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 02/17 9:42 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Wed 02/01 2:59 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 01/12 2:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/13/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 12/21 11:55 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51796 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 88663, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 12/20 12:25 PM
Adversary case 16-51796 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against Colgate-Palmolive Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/20/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 ADR Notice