Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robyn L Moberly
Case #: 1:16-bk-09541
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Raceway Market Land, LLC
9333 N Meridian St Ste 275
Indianapolis, IN 46260-1846
Represented By
Andrew T Kight
Taft, Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Laura A DuVall
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2017 6:01 PM EDT
Friday, March 24, 2017
30 30 answer Reply Fri 9:58 AM
Reply to Motion for Authority filed by Jeffrey M Hendricks on behalf of Creditor First Financial Bank, National Association Related [+]. (Hendricks, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 26
Saturday, March 18, 2017
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Service - Official Court Notice Sun 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - OFFICIAL COURT NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2 Notice Date 03/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28
Thursday, March 16, 2017
28 28 court Official Court Notice Setting Hearing Thu 12:52 PM
Official Court Notice Setting Hearing on Motion for Authority for Single-Asset Real Estate Determination Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 101(51)(B) with Brief in Support of filed by Creditor Beal Bank, USA Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 4/10/2017 at 01:30 PM EDT in Rm 329 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. (mrl)
Related: [-] 26 ,27
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
27 27 misc Brief Wed 11:52 AM
Brief in Support re: Motion for Authority, filed by Mark A Warsco on behalf of Creditor Beal Bank, USA Related [+]. (Warsco, Mark)
Related: [-] 26
26 26 motion Authority, Motion for Wed 11:51 AM
Motion for Authority for Single-Asset Real Estate Determination Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 101(51)(B) filed by Mark A Warsco on behalf of Creditor Beal Bank, USA. (Warsco, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
25 25 notice Substitution of Appearance Wed 5:28 PM
Substitution of Appearance of Andrew T. Kight by John R. Humphrey, filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC. (Humphrey, John)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Appearance Wed 5:25 PM
Appearance filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC. (Humphrey, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Mon 2:56 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order on Motion to Abandon, Order on Motion for Relief from Stay, filed by Mark A Warsco on behalf of Creditor Beal Bank, USA Related [+]. (Warsco, Mark)
Related: [-] 22
22 22 order Order on Motion for Relief from Stay Mon 11:45 AM
Order Granting Motion to Abandon Related [+], Granting Motion for Relief from Stay re: Beal Bank, USA. Attorney for Creditor Beal Bank, USA must distribute this order. (nar)
Related: [-] 17 17
Monday, February 27, 2017
21 21 answer Response Mon 10:41 AM
Response in Support of Motion to Abandon, Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC Related [+]. (Kight, Andrew)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, February 17, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sat 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 14 Notice Date 02/17/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Fri 6:51 PM
Certificate of Service re: Order on Application to Employ, filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC Related [+]. (Kight, Andrew)
Related: [-] 16
Wednesday, February 15, 2017
18 18 notice Objection Notice Wed 11:44 AM
Notice Issued on Motion to Abandon, Motion for Relief from Stay Related [+]. Notice issued; Objections due by 3/1/2017. (nar)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
17 17 motion Abandon, Motion to Tue 11:48 AM
Motion to Abandon, Motion for Relief from Stay and Waiver of 30-Day Preliminary & 60-Day Final Hearing Time Requirement filed by Mark A Warsco on behalf of Creditor Beal Bank, USA. (Warsco, Mark)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 11:50 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay 16-09541 RLM-11) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26881619. Fee amount 181.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, February 06, 2017
16 16 order Employ, Order on Application to Mon 3:18 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP as Debtor's Counsel NUNC PRO TUNC and Setting Procedure for Draw on Retainer Related [+]. Attorney for the debtor must distribute this order. (nar)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, January 12, 2017
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 5:55 PM
Certificate of Service re: Application to Employ, filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC Related [+]. (Kight, Andrew)
Related: [-] 13
14 14 notice Employment Application Notice Thu 2:27 PM
Notice with Certificate of Service dated 1/12/2017 on Application to Employ Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP as Counsel for Debtor NUNC PRO TUNC and Set Procedure for Draw on Retainer (Verified Statement attached), filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC Related [+]. Objections due by 02/02/2017 (Kight, Andrew) CORRECTION: Missing docket text in all capitals. Modified on 1/12/2017 (nar)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 motion Employ, Application to Thu 2:25 PM
Application to Employ Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP as Counsel for Debtor NUNC PRO TUNC and Set Procedure for Draw on Retainer (Verified Statement attached), filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC (Kight, Andrew) CORRECTION: Missing docket text in all capitals. Modified on 1/12/2017 (nar)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
12 12 notice Appearance Mon 3:59 PM
Appearance filed by Paul T. Deignan on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC. (Deignan, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice Sat 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - 341 MEETING NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 19 Notice Date 12/30/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
10 10 court 341 Meeting Notice - Ch 11 Wed 3:08 PM
Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 1/31/2017 at 10:00 AM EST in Rm 416A U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Objections to Dischargeability due by 4/3/2017. (lad)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 24, 2016
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Service - Notice Sun 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - NOTICE Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, December 23, 2016
8 8 misc Income & Expense Statement Fri 2:28 PM
Income & Expense Statement filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC. (Kight, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
7 7 court 7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing Thu 10:28 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Debtor's Attorney. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A text file including names and addresses listed on Schedules D, E, F, G and H must be uploaded through the Creditor Maintenance menu Related [+]. Incomplete Filing due by 12/29/2016. (btw)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 11:02 AM
Appearance filed by Mark A Warsco on behalf of Creditor Beal Bank, USA. (Warsco, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Wed 10:08 AM
Appearance filed by Jeffrey M Hendricks on behalf of Creditor First Financial Bank, National Association. (Hendricks, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
4 4 notice Appearance Tue 3:39 PM
Appearance filed by Laura A DuVall on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (DuVall, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation Tue 2:43 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC. (Kight, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 2:41 PM
Appearance filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Debtor Raceway Market Land, LLC. (Kight, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Tue 2:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with Corporate Ownership Statement, List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Disclosure of Compensation and Verification of Creditor List filed by Andrew T Kight on behalf of Raceway Market Land, LLC. Income & Expense Schedule due by 01/03/2017. (Kight, Andrew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 2:35 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 16-09541 11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26698346. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
court Judge - Terminate/Add Tue 2:41 PM
Judge Robyn L. Moberly assigned. (kpd)
Related: [-]