District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Randolph D Moss
Case #: 1:16-cv-02476
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Last checked: Friday Feb 03, 2017 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
JOHN B. KING, JR.
Represented By
Brian J. Field
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Caroline Lewis Wolverton
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By
Brian J. Field
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Caroline Lewis Wolverton
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Edward Francis Roche
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Chong Seok Park
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
John T. Dey
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GEOFFREY T. BURKHART
Represented By
Edward Francis Roche
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Chong Seok Park
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
John T. Dey
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHELLE D. QUINTERO-MILLAN
Represented By
Edward Francis Roche
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Chong Seok Park
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
John T. Dey
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMIE B. RUDERT
Represented By
Edward Francis Roche
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Chong Seok Park
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
John T. Dey
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
KATE A. VOIGT
Represented By
Edward Francis Roche
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Chong Seok Park
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
John T. Dey
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, February 13, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Mon 9:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the consent motion for an extension of time13 , the motion is hereby GRANTED, and defendant may answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 23, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/13/2017. (lcrdm2, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 9:53 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant may answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before 3/23/2017. (kt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
13 13 motion Extension of Time to Thu 3:09 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JOHN B. KING, JR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION(Wolverton, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Wed 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Caroline Lewis Wolverton on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Brian J. Field (Wolverton, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 3:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2017
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 3:58 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN B. KING, JR served on 12/21/2016 (Park, Chong)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Fri 3:57 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 12/21/2016 (Park, Chong)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Fri 3:55 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/18/2017. (Park, Chong)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Fri 3:52 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/20/2016. (Park, Chong)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2016
6 6 order .Order Thu 2:28 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set out in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2016. (lcrdm1, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Francis Roche on behalf of AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, GEOFFREY T. BURKHART, MICHELLE D. QUINTERO-MILLAN, JAMIE B. RUDERT, KATE A. VOIGT (Roche, Edward)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 5:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Dey on behalf of AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, GEOFFREY T. BURKHART, MICHELLE D. QUINTERO-MILLAN, JAMIE B. RUDERT, KATE A. VOIGT (Dey, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Tue 1:12 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to JOHN B. KING, JR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 9:42 AM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION (Park, Chong)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 9:35 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against JOHN B. KING, JR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4781928) filed by Jamie B. Rudert, AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, Michelle D. Quintero-Millan, Geoffrey T. Burkhart, Kate A. Voigt.(Park, Chong)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 12 Summons addressed to the United States Department of Education,
Att: 13 Summons addressed to John B. King, Jr.,
Att: 14 Summons addressed to the U.S. Attorney General,
Att: 15 Summons addressed to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 1:08 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sb)
Related: [-]