Leader's Hair Studio, Inc.
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Sheri Bluebond |
Case #: | 2:16-bk-26586 |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Debtor
Leader's Hair Studio, Inc.
125810 Carson St.
Hawaiian Gardens, CA 90716 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Elissa Miller (TR)
SulmeyerKupetz 333 S Hope St 35th fl
Los Angeles, CA 90071 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
Docket last updated: 12/21/2016 12:01 AM PST |
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 12/20 3:34 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(2:16-bk-26586) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43909651. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Tue 12/20 3:34 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 01/27/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 2, 915 Wilshire Blvd., 10th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90017. (Chang, Kelly) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 12/20 3:34 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Leader's Hair Studio, Inc. (Chang, Kelly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Tue 12/20 3:34 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Leader's Hair Studio, Inc.. (Chang, Kelly) |