California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Case #: 5:16-cv-07266
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:15 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Terminated:Feb 26, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jun 18, 2017 2:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Acacia Research Corporation
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Edward Reese Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Patricia L. Peden
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Cellular Communications Equipment GMBH
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Edward Reese Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Patricia L. Peden
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Cellular Communications Equipment LLC
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Edward Reese Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Patricia L. Peden
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Conversant Intellectual Property Management Inc.
Represented By
Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Jana I Seidl
Baker Botts
contact info
James G. Kress
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Core Wireless Licensing Ltd.
Represented By
Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Jana I Seidl
Baker Botts
contact info
James G. Kress
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Core Wireless Licensing S.a.r.l.
Represented By
Stuart Christopher Plunkett
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Jana I Seidl
Baker Botts
contact info
James G. Kress
Baker Botts L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Saint Lawrence Communications GMBH
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Edward Reese Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Patricia L. Peden
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Saint Lawrence Communications LLC
Represented By
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady Currry P.C.
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Edward Reese Nelson, III
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Patricia L. Peden
Leclairryan LLP
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady Curry P.C.
contact info
Ryan Griffin
Nelson Bumgardner, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Nokia Corporation
Represented By
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Julia K. York
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Julia K. York
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
James J. Elacqua
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & From LLP
contact info
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Steven C. Sunshine
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
James J. Elacqua
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & From LLP
contact info
Steven C. Sunshine
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nokia Solutions and Networks OY
Represented By
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Julia K. York
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Julia K. York
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
James J. Elacqua
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & From LLP
contact info
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Steven C. Sunshine
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
James J. Elacqua
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & From LLP
contact info
Steven C. Sunshine
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nokia Technologies OY
Represented By
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Julia K. York
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Julia K. York
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
James J. Elacqua
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & From LLP
contact info
Allen Ruby
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Steven C. Sunshine
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
James J. Elacqua
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & From LLP
contact info
Steven C. Sunshine
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Timothy Davis Syrett
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Nina S. Tallon
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Leon Greenfield
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Nell Gibson Moley
Wilmerhale
contact info
Katie Marie Saxton, Esq.
Wilmerhale
contact info
William F. Lee
Wilmer Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
contact info
Joseph J. Mueller
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Mark Daniel Selwyn
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Richard W O'Neill
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 11 2017
ORDER GRANTING 106 STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS NOKIA CORPORATION, NOKIA SOLUTIONS AND NETWORKS OY, NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY, CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS EQUIPMENT LLC, AND CELLULAR COMMUNICATIONS EQUIPMENT GMBH. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/11/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
GPO Sep 12 2017
ORDER DISMISSING CONVERSANT INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC., CORE WIRELESS LICENSING S.A.R.L., AND CORE WIRELESS LICENSING LTD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/12/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
GPO Oct 23 2017
ORDER GRANTING 118 JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY PAGE LIMITS AND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME AND VACATE HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/23/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
GPO Nov 28 2017
ORDER GRANTING 126 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/28/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017)
GPO Dec 19 2017
ORDER GRANTING 134 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/19/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
GPO Jan 04 2018
ORDER GRANTING 137 APPLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/4/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
GPO Jan 23 2018
ORDER GRANTING 131 VOICEAGE CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
GPO Jan 23 2018
ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
GPO Jan 23 2018
ORDER GRANTING 144 VOICEAGE CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/23/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, February 26, 2018
152 152 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 02/26 8:02 AM
ORDER Granting 151 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE FILE. All deadlines/hearings are terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/26/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
Related: [-]
151 151 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 02/26 7:32 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re150 Order on Stipulation, Set Deadlines/Hearings Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Acacia Research Corporation. (Nelson, Edward) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
Related: [-]