Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-51813
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 20, 2016
Terminated:Apr 03, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Flax4Life
Represented By
Flax4Life
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 14, 2018
14 14 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 05/14 2:56 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Related [+] Filed by Peter S. Kravitz (Manning, Margaret)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 04/03 1:25 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51813 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/22 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/22 1:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/21/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, March 19, 2018
11 11 court Default Judgment - NO Interest (VAN-433b) Mon 03/19 9:47 AM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Flax4Life Related [+]. Tickle due by: 4/2/2018. Signed on 3/19/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 9
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default (VAN-431) Mon 03/19 9:38 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Flax4Life Related [+]. Signed on 3/19/2018. (SJS)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, March 16, 2018
9 9 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 03/16 4:14 PM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Filed by Peter S. Kravitz, Esq.. (Manning, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
8 8 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 03/16 4:11 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Peter S. Kravitz, Esq.. (Manning, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, June 30, 2017
7 7 notice Name Change - Notice Fri 06/30 4:59 PM
Notice of Name Change of Plaintiff Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
6 6 order Order Wed 02/22 8:23 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 02/17 10:06 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Wed 02/01 2:59 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 01/12 2:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Flax4Life. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/13/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 12/21 11:55 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51813 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 88663, amount $ 350.00. (COH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2016
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 12/20 1:10 PM
Adversary case 16-51813 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against Flax4Life. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/20/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 ADR Notice