Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh v. RSVC Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-51858 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 20, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
RSVC Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/27 10:39 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51858 Closed (MAS) |
||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC (Bird, L. John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Settlement (Second) of Potential Avoidance Actions and Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Settlement Procedures Order Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant RSVC Company. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/13/2017. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 12/21 6:21 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51858 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8279520, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-51858 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against RSVC Company. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/20/2017. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |