California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Catherine E Bauer
Case #: 8:16-bk-15157
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Debtor and Debtor in Possession
3991 MacArthur Blvd Ste 125
Newport Beach, CA 92660-3049
Represented By
Marc C Forsythe
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 37 minutes ago
Friday, January 20, 2017
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 01/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF)
26 26 notice Notice of motion/application Fri 2:53 PM
Notice of motion/application with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 25 Application to Employ Marc C. Forsythe and Goe & Forsythe, LLP as Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
25 25 motion Employ (motion) Fri 2:51 PM
Application to Employ Marc C. Forsythe and Goe & Forsythe, LLP as Counsel to Debtor and Debtor in Possession with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
24 24 misc Notice to creditors (BNC-PDF) Wed 4:38 PM
Notice to creditors re: notice of hearing on U.S. Trustee's motion to dismiss or convert case to one under Chapter 7 pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1112(b) (BNC-PDF) (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion) Wed 4:05 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) with Declaration and Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
22 22 court Hearing Set(Motion) Wed 3:51 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] 21 U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA)
21 21 motion U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert (motion) Wed 12:26 PM
U.S. Trustee Motion to dismiss or convert Case to One Under Chapter 7 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 1112(b); and Request for Judgment for Quarterly Fees Due and Payable to the U.S. Trustee at the Time of Hearing Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee (SA). (Hauser, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2017
20 20 court Hearing Continued (Other) Fri 12:12 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Mccall, Audrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Monday, January 09, 2017
19 19 misc Statement Mon 4:00 PM
Statement Genesis Capital's Reservation of Rights, Request for Order to Show Cause and Response to Debtor's Scheduling and Case Management Report Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC. (Dulberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 08, 2017
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 9:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 06, 2017
17 17 order Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (BNC-PDF) Fri 11:59 AM
Order granting ex-parte motion to extend time to file schedules, statement of financial affairs, and balance of deficiency documents - Extended to January 18, 2017. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 1/6/2017. (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
16 16 misc Status report Wed 4:00 PM
Status report with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
15 15 motion Extend Deadline to File Schedules and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents - All Chapters) (motion) Wed 1:50 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information, and/or Plan (Case Opening Documents) with Proof of Service Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2016
14 14 misc Request for special notice Wed 3:52 PM
Request for special notice Filed by Interested Party Genesis Capital, LLC. (Dulberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
13 13 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 3:39 PM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Dulberg, Jeffrey. (Dulberg, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 24, 2016
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 12/24/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
Friday, December 23, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 9:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/23/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Thursday, December 22, 2016
8 8 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Thu 3:06 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 2/3/2017 at 10:30 AM at RM 1-159, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Beezer, Cynthia)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice Thu 1:25 PM
Notice of Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference with proof of service Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Related [+]. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-] 5 Order setting scheduling and case management conference - Status Conference set for 1/11/2017 @ 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) (Related Doc # doc ) Signed on 12/21/2016
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
6 6 court Hearing Set (Other) Wed 5:32 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at Crtrm 5D, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Catherine E. Bauer (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
5 5 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Wed 5:31 PM
Order setting scheduling and case management conference - Status Conference set for 1/11/2017 @ 10:00 a.m. (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 12/21/2016 (Firman, Karen)
Related: [-] doc
4 4 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Wed 1:34 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Judge was reassigned due to prior case. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (Beezer, Cynthia)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Judge Reassignment
3 3 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Wed 11:18 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Amended Electronic Filing Declaration Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Wed 10:45 AM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 10:43 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Mt Yohai, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 01/4/2017. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 01/4/2017. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 01/4/2017. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 01/4/2017. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 01/4/2017. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 01/4/2017. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 01/4/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 01/4/2017. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 01/4/2017. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 01/4/2017. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 01/4/2017. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 01/4/2017. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 01/4/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 01/4/2017. (Forsythe, Marc)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 10:47 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:16-bk-15157) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 43914276. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
court Case Reassigned (Manual) Wed 1:33 PM
Judge Catherine E. Bauer added to case per prior filing 8 16-15156 CB. Involvement of Judge Mark S Wallace Terminated (Beezer, Cynthia)
Related: [-]