Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh v. SimplexGrinnell LP
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-51936 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
SimplexGrinnell LP
4700 Exchange Court Suite 300
Boca Raton, FL 33431 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Settlement of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Settlement Procedures Order Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Settlement Pursuant to Settlement Procedures Order Filed by Peter S. Kravitz as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust. (Gellert, Ronald) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 05/22 12:56 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51936 Closed (LMD) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC (Gellert, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() [DUPLICATE ENTRY] Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS) Modified on 2/22/2017 (SJS) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP. Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/13/2017. (Gellert, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 12/21 3:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51936 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8281010, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-51936 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, 549 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against SimplexGrinnell LP. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/21/2017. (Gellert, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |