Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:16-ap-51940
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 21, 2016
Terminated:Feb 24, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
200 Wilmot Road
Deerfield, IL 60015
Represented By
Walgreen Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC
Represented By
Ronald S. Gellert
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, February 24, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/24 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-51940 Closed (MAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2017
7 7 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 02/23 3:41 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
6 6 order Order Wed 02/22 8:45 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Thank or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 2/21/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 02/17 11:00 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Wed 02/01 3:44 PM
Motion to Approve Plaintiff's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/15/2017. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 01/12 4:51 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Walgreen Co.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/13/2017. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 21, 2016
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 12/21 3:54 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-51940 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8281010, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 12/21 1:55 PM
Adversary case 16-51940 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, 549 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Fresh & Easy, LLC against Walgreen Co.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 03/21/2017. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives