Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Jerry A Funk |
Case #: | 3:16-bk-04646 |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 24, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC
3143 SW 32nd Ave Ste 100
Ocala, FL 34474-4404 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - JAX 11
Office of the United States Trustee George C Young Federal Building 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100
Orlando, FL 32801 |
GPO
Apr 10 2018
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law (related document(s)267, 271, 242, 243, 246, 261). Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Eisenhart, Margaret). |
Docket last updated: 12/21/2016 7:00 PM EST |
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Thu 12/22 2:06 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(3:16-bk-04646) [misc,volp11a2] (1717.00). Receipt Number 52187518, Amount Paid $1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Thu 12/22 9:02 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |
||
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 12/22 2:03 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Robert Altman on behalf of Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC. (Altman, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Thu 12/22 2:15 PM
Application to Employ Robert Altman as Attorney for Debtor-in-Possession Filed by Robert Altman on behalf of Debtor Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC (Altman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Proposed Attorney | ||
3 | 3
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Thu 12/22 2:22 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Robert Altman on behalf of Debtor Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC. (Altman, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Thu 12/22 2:27 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Robert Altman on behalf of Debtor Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC (Altman, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" "Budget" | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application to Set Officers' Salary
Thu 12/22 2:34 PM
Application to Set Officers' Salary for Debtor's Manager/Officer and his Wife . Filed by Robert Altman on behalf of Debtor Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC (Altman, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Thu 12/22 2:42 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Robert Altman on behalf of Debtor Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC. (Altman, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Of Service
Thu 12/22 3:24 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Re: Motion for Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Robert Altman on behalf of Debtor Clinical Pet of Ocala, LLC . (Altman, Robert) |