Barchiesi et al v. Charlotte School of Law, LLC et al
North Carolina Western District Court | |
Judge: | Graham Mullen |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00861 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Case Filed: | Dec 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 20, 2017 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Charlotte School of Law, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
InfiLaw Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lejla Hadzic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert C Barchiesi
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
InfiLaw Holding, LLC
Terminated: 04/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |