Dean v. Billings et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Vicki Miles-Lagrange |
Case #: | 5:16-cv-01459 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 21, 2016 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 19, 2017 4:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
Michael Billings
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Midway Island LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Urika Dean
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against two metro strip clubs seeking unpaid hourly wages, overtime pay and damages (kfor.com) |
Submitted Tue 12/27/2016 | |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Administrative Closing Order
Wed 05/23 3:31 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 30 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/23/2018. (ks) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 05/23 2:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs. (Wells, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 05/10 10:12 AM
ORDER DENIES plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment33 . Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/10/2018. (ac) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
notice
~Notice (other)
Wed 04/25 3:57 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Yasmine Triplet(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Yasmine Triplet | ||
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Docket
Fri 04/13 11:25 AM
JUNE CIVIL TRIAL DOCKET: Docket Call set for 6/6/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Jury Trial set for 6/12/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. (ks) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
trial
Exhibit List
Tue 04/10 4:08 PM
Exhibit List by Defendants Michael Billings, Midway Island LLC. (Pitts, H) |
|
36 | 36
trial
Witness List
Tue 04/10 4:07 PM
Witness List by Defendants Michael Billings, Midway Island LLC. (Pitts, H) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
trial
Witness List
Mon 04/02 12:36 PM
Witness List by Plaintiff Urika Dean. (Wells, Joshua) |
|
34 | 34
trial
Exhibit List
Mon 04/02 12:36 PM
Exhibit List by Plaintiff Urika Dean. (Wells, Joshua) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 04/02 12:17 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Urika Dean.(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Declaration of Joshua D. Wells | ||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 03/30 10:29 AM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Jaymie Lee Shaw(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Jaymie Lee Shaw | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
~Notice (other)
Wed 02/21 10:34 AM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Latoya Thomas(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Latoya Thomas | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 02/09 4:49 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Zhenyia Berry(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Zhenyia Berry | ||
29 | 29
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 02/09 4:48 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Zhane' Perry(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Zhane' Perry | ||
28 | 28
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 02/09 4:47 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Nicole Clifton(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Nicole Clifton | ||
27 | 27
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 02/09 4:46 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Falicha Williamson(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Falicha Williamson | ||
26 | 26
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 02/09 4:44 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Elizabeth Youngblood(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Elizabeth Youngblood | ||
25 | 25
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 02/09 4:43 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Chanelle Hill(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Chanelle Hill | ||
24 | 24
notice
~Notice (other)
Fri 02/09 4:41 PM
NOTICE (other) by All Plaintiffs of Filing of Consent to Sue of Amber Walden(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Executed Consent of Amber Walden | ||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/01 12:30 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Larry E Finn terminated. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 2/1/2018. (ks) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/01 2:43 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Michael Billings, Midway Island LLC. (Finn, Larry) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Certify Class
Fri 12/01 3:25 PM
ORDER granting18 plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Class Certification, to Approve Notice and Consent, for Authorization to Conduct Discovery on the Identity of All Putative Class Members and Authorization to Send Notice to Potential Class Members (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/1/2017. (ks) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Thu 11/16 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Compliance with Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by H Craig Pitts on behalf of Michael Billings, Midway Island LLC (Pitts, H) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Thu 11/02 10:31 AM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re18 MOTION to Certify Class , to Approve Notice and Consent, for Authorization to Conduct Discovery on the Identity of all Putative Class Members and Authorization to Send Notice to Potential Class Members and Brief in Support filed by Urika Dean. (Wells, Joshua) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Certify Class
Thu 11/02 10:30 AM
MOTION to Certify Class , to Approve Notice and Consent, for Authorization to Conduct Discovery on the Identity of all Putative Class Members and Authorization to Send Notice to Potential Class Members and Brief in Support by Urika Dean.(Wells, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Pendency | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/07 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the June 2018 trial docket (6/12/2018 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 304 before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 4/1/2017; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 4/11/2017; Pla witness list due 4/1/2017; Dft witness list due 4/11/2017; Pla exhibit list due 4/1/2017; Dft exhibit list due 4/11/2017; Motions in limine due 5/24/2018; Jury instructions due 5/24/2018; Voir dire requests due 5/24/2018; Trial briefs due 5/24/2018; Discovery due by 5/1/2018. Motions due by 4/1/2018. Pretrial Report due by 5/24/2018. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 6/6/2017. (ks) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan
Tue 05/30 3:36 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Urika Dean. (Wells, Joshua) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 05/12 3:46 PM
ORDER denying12 Defendant Michael Billings' Amended Motion to Dismiss and finding as moot11 Defendant Michael Billings' Motion to Dismiss (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 5/12/2017. (ks) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Docket
Mon 04/03 11:08 AM
JUNE STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2017 03:20 PM in Chambers before Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange. Status Report due by 5/30/2017. (ks) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/28 2:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss ,12 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss filed by Urika Dean. (Wells, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Wed 03/08 10:51 AM
AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Billings. (Finn, Larry) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Tue 03/07 6:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Billings. (Finn, Larry) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 03/07 6:35 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E Finn on behalf of Michael Billings (Finn, Larry) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/27 4:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Urika Dean. Michael Billings served on 2/15/2017. (Federman, William) |
|
Thursday, January 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer
Thu 01/19 1:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Midway Island LLC.(Finn, Larry) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 01/19 1:15 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Larry E Finn on behalf of Midway Island LLC (Finn, Larry) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/29 9:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Urika Dean. Midway Island LLC served on 12/28/2016. (Federman, William) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 12/29 9:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Urika Dean. Michael Billings served on 12/28/2016. (Federman, William) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 12/29 9:52 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Joshua D Wells on behalf of Urika Dean (Wells, Joshua) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Thu 12/29 9:50 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by William B Federman on behalf of Urika Dean (Federman, William) |
|
Thursday, December 22, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 12/22 9:38 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Billings, Midway Island LLC. (kr) |
|
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Thu 12/22 10:45 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2411262. (Federman, William) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/22 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Michael Billings, Midway Island LLC filed by Urika Dean.(kr) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1 Consent to Join, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |