Areej Salem, LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Roberta A Colton |
Case #: | 8:16-bk-10866 |
Case Filed: | Dec 23, 2016 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jan 26, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Debtor
Areej Salem, LLC
12213 Brightwater Blvd
Temple Terrace, FL 33617-1708 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Beth Ann Scharrer
Trustee PO Box 4550
Seminole, FL 33775 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA7/13
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 01/26/2017 6:15 PM EST |
Friday, December 23, 2016 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 12/23 7:27 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8:16-bk-10866) [misc,volp7a2] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 52192725, Amount Paid $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 12/23 7:25 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. Health Care Business.. (Fee Paid.). Schedules and Statements Not Filed Disclosure of Compensation. Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed . Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed or Not Required . Filed by Daniel J. Herman on behalf of Areej Salem, LLC. (Herman, Daniel) |