Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01307 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation
570 Sylvan Ave.,
Englewood Cliffs,, NJ 07632 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
49 | 49
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Fri 06/03 1:20 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/03 2:57 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1307 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
48 | 48
234
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 01/11 9:54 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 12/10/2018 At 11:04 AM RE: Motion To Approve Motion Of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) Of The Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Existing Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/11/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/18/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/1/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/11/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/11/2022. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Saturday, May 08, 2021 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Entry of Default
Sun 05/09 12:28 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Clerk's Entry of Default . Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 06, 2021 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Clerk's Entry of Default
Thu 05/06 12:40 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation. (Lopez, Mary) |
|
Monday, May 03, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 05/03 12:31 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B -- Second Summons | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C -- NJ DOS Report | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D -- Affidavit of Service | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E -- Supplemental Complaint | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F -- Third Summons | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G -- Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H -- Fourth Summons | ||
Thursday, March 11, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
ans
Declaration
Thu 03/11 7:09 PM
Declaration of Christopher J. Lucht in Support of Request for Certificate of Default filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Second Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B -- Second Summons | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C -- NJ DOS Report | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D -- Affidavit of Service | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E -- Supplemental Second Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F -- Third Summons | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G -- Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H -- Fourth Summons | ||
Monday, May 04, 2020 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Motion, Summary Judgment
Mon 05/04 10:03 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment on Notice of Settlement of RMBS Claims filed by Brant Kuehn on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Kuehn, Brant) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Partial Summary Judgment | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Undisputed Fact in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Notice of RMBS Claims | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Brant D. Kuehn | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 28, 2020 | ||
42 | 42
misc
Transcript
Mon 03/09 3:11 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/7/19 at 11:07 AM RE: Notice of Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/28/2020. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/6/2020. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/30/2020. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/28/2020. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 10/22 12:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 09/27 3:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Notice, Withdrawal
Thu 09/05 4:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
Wed 06/12 4:15 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Regarding Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Relieving Fox Rothschild LLP as Co-Counsel for LBHI Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Tue 05/21 6:02 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Relieving Fox Rothschild LLP as Co-Counsel for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. Objections due by 5/31/2019,(Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/08 7:13 PM
Certificate of Service of the Third Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Supplemental Second Amended Adversary Complaint with Exhibits A-D Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Sunday, April 07, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
answer
Reply
Sun 04/07 8:28 AM
Reply to Motion Omnibus Reply to The Objections to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.s Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants in The New Adversary Proceedings to The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
161
pgs
misc
Transcript
Wed 05/01 1:02 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/29/18 At 11:04 AM RE: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Motion For Leave To File Amended Complaints Pursuant To Rule 7015 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/8/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/12/2019. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/6/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/8/2019. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Motion, Approve
Thu 03/21 11:34 AM
Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of The Bankruptcy Code to Administratively Coordinate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets And Bind Additional Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings To The Case Management Order In Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 4/9/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) Responses due by 4/2/2019,. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Case Management Order | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - New RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Coordinated GSE and RMBS Indemnification Actions | ||
Thursday, March 14, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
ans
Statement
Thu 03/14 4:16 PM
Statement Amended Case Management Order signed on 3/13/2019 filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits 1-4 of the Amended Case Management Order | ||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Motion, Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 02/28 5:58 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Motion of Corey J. Longhurst to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Responses due by 3/11/2019,. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Motion, Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 02/26 7:03 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Motion of Maritza Dominguez Braswell to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Responses due by 3/8/2019,. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, February 20, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 02/20 2:27 PM
Fourth Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Tue 02/19 10:50 AM
Request for a Fourth Summons filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
||
Tuesday, February 12, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice, Hearing
Tue 02/12 4:56 PM
Notice of Hearing filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2019 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter
Mon 02/11 12:47 PM
Letter Memorandum Endorsed Order Granting Request signed on 2/7/2019 Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, February 06, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Letter
Wed 02/06 3:01 PM
Letter to Judge Shelley C. Chapman re: Service Period Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Lieber, Mara) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 01/23 4:29 PM
Affidavit of Service of Wing Chan filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Garabato, Sid) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Mon 01/07 2:12 PM
Third Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation . (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 01/04 3:52 PM
Request for a Summons filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
||
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
order
Motion, Approve
Thu 12/13 2:52 PM
Order Regarding Motion to Bind signed on 12/13/2018. (White, Greg) |
|
Sunday, December 09, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
other
Certificate, Service
Sun 12/09 8:50 PM
Certificate of Service of the Notice Of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of the Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets and Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings to the Existing Case Management Order in Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Saturday, December 08, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Sat 12/08 5:28 PM
Certificate of Service of the Notice Of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant To Section 105(A) of the Bankruptcy Code To Administratively Consolidate Related Adversary Proceeding Dockets and Bind Defendants In The New Adversary Proceedings to the Existing Case Management Order in Adversary Proceeding No. 16-01019 Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 12/06 6:27 PM
Amended Complaint against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation SUPPLEMENTAL SECOND AMENDED ADVERSARY COMPLAINT Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
18 | 18
ans
Statement
Thu 12/06 3:30 PM
Statement OMNIBUS REPLY TO THE OBJECTIONS TO LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC.S MOTION PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO | ||
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Motion, Amend
Fri 11/30 4:06 PM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Pleadings signed on 11/30/2018. (White, Greg) |
|
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion, Approve
Mon 11/19 7:23 PM
Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE RELATED ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS AND BIND DEFENDANTS IN THE NEW ADVERSARY PROCEEDINGS TO THE EXISTING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN ADVERSARY PROCEEDING NO. 16-01019 filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 12/10/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Binding Additional Defendants to CMO and Coordinate | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Wed 10/10 4:01 PM
Letter to Judge Shelly C. Chapman Re: Defendants loan numbers and corresponding loan amounts believed to be at issue in the proposed Third Amended Complaints Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
81
pgs
misc
Transcript
Tue 01/22 3:21 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/2/18 at 2:01 PM RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/3/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/12/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/5/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/3/2019. (Cales, Humberto) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Motion, Amend
Mon 10/01 9:51 PM
Motion to Amend LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 7015 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. with hearing to be held on 10/29/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (SCC). (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1 Pleading MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. IN SUPPORT OF ITS OMNIBUS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINTS PURSUANT TO RULE 7015 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Redline of Amended Complaint | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice, Hearing
Thu 08/23 12:57 PM
Notice of Hearing NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/2/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (SCC) (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
other
Certificate, Service
Tue 03/21 6:10 PM
Certificate of Service of the Order to Administratively Coordinate Adversary Proceeding Dockets Under the Case Management Order and Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
ans
Statement
Wed 03/08 11:58 AM
Statement An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i) directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. (Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as the Central Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
ans
Statement
Tue 03/07 7:36 PM
Statement Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 02/28 4:13 PM
Affidavit of Service of the Second Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference, Second Amended Adversary Complaint, and Case Management Order Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
other
Certificate, Service
Wed 02/22 8:51 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Affidavit of Service
Fri 02/10 7:20 PM
Affidavit of Service Motion to Administratively Consolidate Adversary Proceeding Dockets Under the Case Management Order filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment
Fri 02/10 5:12 PM
Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Tue 02/07 11:57 AM
Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Tue 02/07 11:41 AM
(Please Disregard Entry. See Document Number 5 for correct Entry) Second Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation . (Ortiz, Carmen) Modified on 2/7/2017 (Porter, Minnie) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Mon 02/06 4:54 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Motion, Approve
Wed 01/25 2:44 PM
Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. FOR AN ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) AND BANKRUPTCY RULE 7042 filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion to Admin Consolidate Dockets | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order to Admin Consolidate Dockets | ||
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (PDF Upload)
Wed 12/28 4:12 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation (Dawes, Jeanelle) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 12/27 7:59 PM
Adversary case 16-01307 Complaint against First Residential Mortgage Services Corporation Second Amended (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Caleb Durling, Michael A. Rollin, Corey J Longhurst, Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Maritza Dominguez Braswell, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Identification of Agreements | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Identification of Defective Loans | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Description of Defective Loans |