Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. K & B CAPITAL CORP
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01321 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 27, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
K & B Capital Corp.
100 Broadway 8th Floor
New York, NY 10005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
![]() So Ordered Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice signed on 9/13/2017 (White, Greg) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 09/13 2:59 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1321 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Letter Memorandum Endorsed Order Granting Plan Administrators Request; A Pre-Motion Conference is Scheduled for 5/11/17 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Letter LBHI response to letters requesting pre-motion conferences Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Certificate of Service of Order to Bind Additional Defendants to the Existing Case Management Order, Order to Administratively Coordinate Adversary Proceeding Dockets Under the Case Management Order and Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Statement An Order has been entered in this adversary proceeding (i) directing it to be coordinated with other similar adversary proceedings filed in connection with the jointly administered Chapter 11 cases of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. (Case No. 08-13555 , and (ii) establishing the docket for Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. 1st Advantage Mortgage, L.L.C., et al., Adv. Pro. No. 16-01019 as the Central Docket for all Actions, which docket should be consulted for all adversary proceedings covered under the Courts Order filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() Statement Order Extending Time for Defendants to File Consolidated Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service of Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Affidavit of Service of the Memorandum Endorsed Order re: Pre-Motion Conference signed on 2/1/2017 Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Affidavit of Service of Motion to Consolidate Adversary Proceeding Dockets Under the Case Management Order filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() So Ordered Stipulation Substituting Attorney signed on 2/2/2017 (White, Greg) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Letter Response of LBHI to the Letter Requests Submitted Pursuant to the Case Management Order Filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. FOR AN ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) AND BANKRUPTCY RULE 7042 filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Letter Request for a Pre-Motion Conference Filed by Glen Alan Kendall on behalf of K & B Capital Corp.. (Kendall, Glen) |
|
Friday, January 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Affidavit of Service of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Second Amended Adversary Complaint Filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against K & B Capital Corp. (Dawes, Jeanelle) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-01321 Complaint against K & B CAPITAL CORP Second Amended (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Caleb Durling, Michael A. Rollin, Corey J Longhurst, Mara R Lieber, William A Maher, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Maritza Dominguez Braswell, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |