Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:16-ap-01686
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Dec 29, 2016
Terminated:Feb 28, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Exchange Time, LLC
Represented By
American Exchange Time, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Steven J. Solomon, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
6 6 court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/28 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1686 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Wed 02/22 9:27 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/04 3:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk Related [+]. (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk,2 Summons Issued,3 Order Setting Requirements
Friday, December 30, 2016
3 3 order Order Setting Requirements (Adv) Fri 12/30 11:11 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Fri 12/30 11:10 AM
Summons Issued on American Exchange Time, LLC Answer Due 1/30/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk
Thursday, December 29, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 12/29 10:57 AM
Adversary case 16-01686 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against American Exchange Time, LLC. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven)
Related: [-]