Berk v. Blue Planet International, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-16885
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01688 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Blue Planet International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles M. Berk
GrayRobinson, P.A. c/o Steven J. Solomon, Esq. 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 3200
Miami, FL 33131 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 08/07 10:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1688 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding (with prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk. (Schatzman, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Charles M. Berk . (Solomon, Steven) |
|
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Blue Planet International, Inc. Answer Due 1/30/2017 [Trial Date Shall be Set at Pre-Trial Conference] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/08/2017 at 01:30 PM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 8 (LMI), Miami, FL 33128. (Grimm, Carmela) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-01688 Complaint by Charles M. Berk against Blue Planet International, Inc.. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Solomon, Steven) |