Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. v. CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
Lead BK case is: 1:08-bk-13555
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Shelley C Chapman |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-01340 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
California Financial Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Friday, June 03, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Dismissal filed by Adam M Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 06/03 2:36 PM
Adversary Case 1:16-ap-1340 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (White, Greg) |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Documents filed by Christopher J Lucht on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lucht, Christopher) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice and Documents filed by Brad Jeffrey Axelrod on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Axelrod, Brad) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record and Request for Removal from ECF Service filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Certificate of Service of Memorandum Endorsed Order re: Pre-Motion Conferences Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service of Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
9 | 9
![]() SECOND Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against California Financial Group, Inc. (Ortiz, Carmen) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
misc
Request for Subsequent Summons
Fri 02/17 1:57 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
||
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. for an Order to Administratively Consolidate Adversary Proceeding Dockets Under the Case Management Order and Pursuant to U.S.C. § 105(a) and Bankruptcy Rule 7042 Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Notice of Presentment OF REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY COORDINATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of Service of (i) Notice of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code to Bind Additional Defendants to the Existing Case Management Order; and (ii) Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code to Bind Additional Defendants to the Existing Case Management Order Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to Approve MOTION OF LEHMAN BROTHERS HOLDINGS INC. FOR AN ORDER TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE ADVERSARY PROCEEDING DOCKETS UNDER THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND PURSUANT TO U.S.C. § 105(a) AND BANKRUPTCY RULE 7042 filed by Adam M. Bialek on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Bialek, Adam) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to Approve Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code to Bind Additional Defendants to the Existing Case Management Order filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Rollin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service of the Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference and Second Amended Adversary Complaint upon California Financial Group, Inc. Filed by Mara R Lieber on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lieber, Mara) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against California Financial Group, Inc. Answer Due: 1/30/2017. (Dawes, Jeanelle) |
|
Wednesday, December 28, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 16-01340 Complaint against CALIFORNIA FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. Second Amended Adversary Complaint (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by John D Giampolo, William A Maher, Caleb Durling, Corey J Longhurst, Mara R Lieber, Adam M. Bialek, James N Lawlor, Michael A. Rollin, Maritza Dominguez Braswell, Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Maher, William) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |