SABLOSKY v. MCCONNELL et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Reggie B Walton |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-02528 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 27, 2017 5:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MITCH MCCONNELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NANCY PELOSI
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PAUL RYAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ORRIN G. HATCH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHARLES E. SCHUMER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BRET SABLOSKY
9466 Georgia Avenue #61
Silver Spring, MD 20910 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 09/12 1:23 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to18 Notice of Appeal, filed by BRET SABLOSKY. USCA Case Number 17-5097 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 order filed July 26, 2017 | ||
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 07/19 11:09 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by BRET SABLOSKY ; USCA Case Number 17-5007 (td) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Order | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 05/09 11:58 AM
USCA Case Number 17-5097 for18 Notice of Appeal, filed by BRET SABLOSKY. (td) |
||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 05/04 2:19 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re18 Notice of Appeal,. (td) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 05/04 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to17 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Order on Motion for Recusal,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by BRET SABLOSKY. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Recusal Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 04/03 12:12 PM
ORDER. Because the Court concludes that it lacks subject-matter jurisdiction over this dispute, for the reasons set forth in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's Motion for Recusal, ECF No. 10, and Motion for Attorney's Fees, ECF No. 12, and the defendant's motion to dismiss, ECF No. 14, are also DENIED AS MOOT due to the Court's lack of jurisdiction. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/3/2017. (lcrbw3) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 03/29 10:46 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN G. HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES E. SCHUMER.(Walker, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
15 | 15
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 03/29 10:45 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re10 MOTION for Recusal filed by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN G. HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES E. SCHUMER.(Walker, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss
Wed 03/29 10:44 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN G. HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES E. SCHUMER(Walker, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 02/28 2:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Responses due by 4/2/2017 (hs) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/27 4:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendants' Consent Motion for Extensions of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file their responses to the plaintiff's amended complaint, motion to recuse, and motion for attorney's fees on or before April 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/27/2017. (lcrbw3) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 02/23 7:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION for Attorney Fees,10 MOTION for Recusal and to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN G. HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES E. SCHUMER(Walker, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 02/17 4:33 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by BRET SABLOSKY (td) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/17 4:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN G. HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES E. SCHUMER filed by BRET SABLOSKY.(td) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Recusal
Fri 02/10 2:54 PM
MOTION for Recusal by BRET SABLOSKY (td) |
|
Friday, January 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply to (non-motion) Document
Fri 01/13 4:15 PM
REPLY re6 Response to Order of the Court filed by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES SCHUMER.(Walker, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, January 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 01/12 3:50 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 1/12/17 re7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (td) |
|
7 | 7
appeal
Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
Thu 01/12 3:48 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to4 Order on Motion for TRO,, by BRET SABLOSKY. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 4616082437. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (td) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 01/13 10:28 AM
USCA Case Number 17-5007 for7 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by BRET SABLOSKY. (zrdj) |
||
Monday, January 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to Order of the Court
Tue 01/10 4:23 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re4 Order on Motion for TRO,, filed by BRET SABLOSKY. (td) |
|
Wednesday, January 04, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/04 9:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause Order due by 1/6/2017. Defendants' Response due by 1/13/2017 (hs) |
||
Friday, December 30, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/30 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants(Walker, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for TRO
Fri 12/30 2:28 PM
ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall show cause in writing, on or before January 6, 2017, why his Complaint should not be dismissed on the grounds that the Court lacks jurisdiction to entertain the relief the plaintiff is requesting, and the issue raised by the plaintiff is more appropriately raised before the other two branches of government. The defendants may file a reply, if they wish to do so, in response to the plaintiff's response to this Order on or before January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 30, 2016. (lcrbw1) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Thu 12/29 5:04 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BRET SABLOSKY (zrdj) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Thu 12/29 5:03 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by BRET SABLOSKY (zrdj) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/29 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES SCHUMER ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616082272) filed by BRET SABLOSKY.(zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 12/29 5:02 PM
SUMMONS (8) Issued as to JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, ORRIN HATCH, MITCH MCCONNELL, NANCY PELOSI, PAUL RYAN, CHARLES SCHUMER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) |